Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01622
Date Filed2016-08-10
Date Closed2016-12-29
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Energy and Environment Legal Institute submitted two FOIA requests to the National Institutes of Health for email correspondence of two NIH employees involving several other parties and keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-101COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4634043) filed by ENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons To Attorney General, # 3 Summons To Dept of Health and Human Services, # 4 Summons To US Attorney)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-102Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENERGY AND ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Mandelbaum, Chaim) Modified on 8/11/2016 (zrdj). (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-10Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sth) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-184NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/15/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/16/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/16/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/15/2016.) (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-09-156ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-157ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 29, 2016. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/15/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-298Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-29MINUTE ORDER: In light of 8 the parties' joint status report filed on September 29, 2016, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 28, 2016, that updates the court on the status of Defendant's responses to Plaintiff's FOIA requests and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/29/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-29Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/28/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-11-289Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall file on or before December 28, 2016, a subsequent Status Report, informing the court of the status of the parties' settlement discussions and, if necessary, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/29/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-2810STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff