Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01631
Date Filed2016-08-11
Date Closed2017-07-26
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPEER submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning the agency's consideration of possibly replacing Fisheries Observers with video‚Ä"camera monitoring. The agency told PEER it required clarification of one of seven items requested. PEER provided the clarification, but after hearing nothing further from the agency as to the processing of its request, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-111COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4636375) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Defendant Agency, # 3 Summons Defendant US Attorney, # 4 Summons Defendant US Attorney General)(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-112Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-113CIVIL COVER SHEET corrected (signed) by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY re 1 Complaint, filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY.(Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
2016-08-11Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sth) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-124SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION served on 8/15/2016 (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/16/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/15/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/16/2016. (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-248NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-09-149Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-15ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Answer shall be filed no later than October 17, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/15/2016. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-10-1410Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-14MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay: This matter is hereby STAYED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a status report with the Court no later than November 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/14/2016. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-11-1411Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, this matter shall remain STAYED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report no later than December 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/15/2016. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2016 (zlsj) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-12-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, this matter shall remain STAYED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report no later than January 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/19/2016. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/16/2017. Case Stayed (zlsj) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2017-01-1713STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-1814NOTICE of consent to status report by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY re 13 Status Report (Dumais, Laura) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-18MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 13 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall make its best efforts to produce the documents identified by Plaintiff as responsive no later than March 6, 2017. This matter shall remain stayed and the parties shall file a status report on or before March 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/18/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Production of responsive documents due by 3/6/2017. Status Report due by 3/20/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-03-0315Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Upcoming Deadlines by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall produce the documents identified by Plaintiff as responsive on or before March 20, 2017. It is further ORDERED that this matter shall remain stayed and the parties shall file a status report on or before April 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/7/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-08(Case Stayed) Set/Reset Deadlines: Production Responsive Documents due by 3/20/2017. Status Report due by 4/3/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-04-0316Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-0517NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paula Naomi Dinerstein on behalf of PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY Substituting for attorney Laura Marie Colangelo Dumais (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 16 Joint Status Report, this matter shall remain stayed. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit either a joint status report, stipulation of settlement and dismissal, or a proposed schedule for summary judgment briefing no later than May 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/5/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2017 (zlsj) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-05-1818Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-18MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit either a joint status report, stipulation of settlement and dismissal, or a proposed schedule for summary judgment briefing no later than June 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/18/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report, stipulation of settlement and dismissal, or a proposed schedule for summary judgment briefing due by 6/19/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
2017-06-1919Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit either a joint status report, stipulation of settlement and dismissal, or a proposed schedule for summary judgment briefing no later than July 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/19/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/18/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-07-2020STIPULATION of Dismissal by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff