Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOMMITTEE FOR EFFICIENT GOVERNMENT, LLC v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01638
Date Filed2016-08-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffCOMMITTEE FOR EFFICIENT GOVERNMENT, LLC
Case DescriptionThe Committee for Efficient Government submitted a number of FOIA requests to the IRS for records pertaining to various allegations of misconduct. According to CFEG, the agency failed to respond to any of its requests. CFEG then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-121COMPLAINT against All Defendants Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4636790) filed by COMMITTEE FOR EFFICIENT GOVERNMENT, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Commissioner's Office, # 3 Summons US Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons US Attorney General)(Pasano, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-122Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMITTEE FOR EFFICIENT GOVERNMENT, LLC. (Pasano, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-123NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by COMMITTEE FOR EFFICIENT GOVERNMENT, LLC. Case related to Case No. 1:15-cv-01841. (Pasano, Michael) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-12Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (dr) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-124SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(dr) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-09-215Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 5 the Internal Revenue Service's unopposed motion for an extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Internal Revenue Service is directed to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by not later than October 21, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/21/16. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-10-216ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-217ORDER directing parties to file a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/21/16. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/18/2016. (tb) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-11-188Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report and request to defer setting the briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the request is GRANTED. The Court will defer setting a briefing schedule at this time, and the parties shall submit another joint status report by not later than March 31, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/18/16. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2017. (tb) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2017-03-309STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court will continue to defer setting a briefing schedule at this time. The parties shall file another joint status report by not later than June 30, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/31/17. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-06-3010Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court will continue to defer setting a briefing schedule at this time. The parties shall file another joint status report by not later than September 29, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/3/17. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/29/2017. (tg) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-09-2911Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-10-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court will continue to defer setting a briefing schedule at this time. The parties shall file another joint status report by not later than January 5, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/02/2017. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
2017-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-11-02Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge John D. Bates is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff