Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01639
Date Filed2016-08-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR")
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Review submitted a number of FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning employees as well as records pertaining to a number of programs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ("USCIS")
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-121COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4637039) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for US Attorney, # 4 Summons for Defendant, # 5 Certificate Rule LCvR7.1)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-122LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (md) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-12Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (md) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 8/25/2016 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/19/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/19/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/18/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-09-197NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-198ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-28MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/28/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/14/2016. (zlsj) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-10-149Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of 9 parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall finish producing documents to Plaintiff by April 14, 2017. At the conclusion of production, parties shall meet and confer and, if necessary, propose a summary-judgment briefing schedule to the Court. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/14/2016. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Discovery due by 4/14/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2017-08-02MINUTE ORDER: On October 14, 2016, the Court established a deadline for the production of records and requested that the parties submit a briefing schedule, if necessary. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report on or by August 4, 2017 informing the Court of the status of production and the need for any further proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/2/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
2017-08-03MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or by September 1, 2017 updating the Court on the status of discussions and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/3/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-3011Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by October 20, 2017 updating the Court on the status of the parties' progress and effort to resolve this case. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/30/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-10-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-10-23MINUTE ORDER: In light of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties submit another Joint Status Report by November 21, 2017 updating the Court on the status of any outstanding issues. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/23/2017. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/21/2017 (lsj) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-11-2113STIPULATION by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-22MINUTE ORDER: In response to the parties' 13 Joint Stipulation, the Court advises the parties that while it encourages and appreciates the narrowing of disputed issues through mutual agreement, the Court generally does not permit parties to set or extend production deadlines and briefing schedules by stipulation, only by motion. The Court in this case will accept the parties' stipulated dates and ORDER that the remaining processing and production of records be completed within 160 days of the filing of the Joint Stipulation. The Court further ORDERS that the parties file a joint status report on or before May 14, 2018. This schedule strikes the Court as generous in light of the scope of the disputed issues identified in the Stipulation. As a result, the parties are advised that should disputed issues remain at the the conclusion of the production, the Court will impose an expeditious schedule for the production of a Vaughn index and briefing on summary judgment. Further extensions of the current schedule shall be looked upon with disfavor as well. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/22/2017. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/14/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 11/27/2017)
2017-12-04Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff