Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01658
Date Filed2016-08-16
Date Closed2017-03-20
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Muhammad Ali. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-161COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4641160) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons FBI, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-162LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-17Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (dr) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-08-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(zdr) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-08-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/22/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/21/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/22/16., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/22/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-09-225ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-10-056Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-177ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/14/2016. (lcrcl3, ) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's first production of documents to plaintiff due by 11/21/2016; Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2016. (tg) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-12-028Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-299SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 2/3/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/28/16. (zlsj) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
2017-02-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-03-1711STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff