Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01659
Date Filed2016-08-16
Date Closed2017-04-25
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning contracts with the security firm G4S for transportation of illegal immigrants from the Mexican border into the interior of the United States. Judicial Watch also submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the number of illegal immigrants transported by G4S. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-161COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4641183) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-162LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-18Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/22/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/21/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/22/16., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/22/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-09-205MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-23MINUTE ORDER: Granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by October 24, 2016 Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/23/16. (DJS) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/24/2016, (zsm) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-10-246MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-25MINUTE ORDER: Granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer and/or other response to the Complaint shall be due on or before November 23, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/25/16. (DJS) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-11-227ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-26MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than 12/12/16. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/16. (DJS) Modified on 11/28/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 11/26/2016)
2016-12-128Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 8 it is hereby ordered that: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than February 15, 2017 advising this court whether the parties wish to file cross-motions for summary judgment, whether further productions will be made, or whether the parties seek further time to resolve the litigation informally, and proposing a schedule for whichever course they propose. The parties' Joint Status shall include a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/14/16. (DJS) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/15/2017 (zsm) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2017-01-179NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alexander Kenneth Haas on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Carl E. Ross (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-02-1310Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-15MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report 10 filed by the parties, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than May 15, 2017, advising the court whether Defendant's production of documents is complete, whether the parties intend to file cross-motions for summary judgment or seek further time to resolve the litigation informally. A proposed order shall accompanying the Joint Status Report. The parties shall avoid proposing a schedule the contemplates simultaneous cross motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/15/17. (DJS) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2017. (tb) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-03-1611NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Substituting for attorney Alexander Kenneth Haas (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-04-2112STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-2413ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Dismissing action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/24/17. (DJS) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff