Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01717
Date Filed2016-08-24
Date Closed2017-09-06
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (FAIR)
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted multiple FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning a variety of issues. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-241COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4649599) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney for D.C., # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons Defendant, # 5 Certificate Rule LCvR7.1)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (dr) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-25Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (dr) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(dr) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/29/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/28/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 8/29/2016 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/29/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-09-197NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-288ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-28MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 13, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/28/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/13/2016 (tj) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-10-139Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-14MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that the the parties shall submit a status report and proposed briefing schedule on or before December 12, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/14/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/12/2016 Status Report due by 12/12/2016 (tj) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-12-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report, which shall include a briefing schedule if necessary, by February 13, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/12/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2017-02-1311Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter on or before April 20, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/13/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/20/2017 (tj) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-04-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-21MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties representations in 12 their joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, with a proposed briefing schedule if necessary, by June 13, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/21/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/13/2017 (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-06-1213Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-12MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposal in 13 their joint status report: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report, with a proposed briefing schedule if necessary, by July 19, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/12/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/19/2017 (tj) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-07-1814Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-18MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposal in 14 their joint status report: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report, with a proposed briefing schedule if necessary, by September 15, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/18/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/15/2017 (tj) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-09-0515STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff