Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01751
Date Filed2016-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Case DescriptionThe American Center for Law and Justice submitted a multi-part FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning atrocities committed by ISIS against Christians in Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Center for Law and Justice filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4655963) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sekulow, Jay) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-302NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Alan Sekulow on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sekulow, Jay) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-303NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart J. Roth on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Roth, Stuart) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-30Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sth) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-304MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Craig L. Parshall, :Firm- American Center for Law and Justice, :Address- 201 Maryland Avenue, NE, Washington, DC 20002. Phone No. - 202-546-8890. Fax No. - 202-546-9309 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4656125. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Stuart) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-305SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-306MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Benjamin P. Sisney, :Firm- American Center for Law and Justice, :Address- 201 Maryland Avenue, NE, Washington, DC 20002. Phone No. - 202-546-8890. Fax No. - 202-546-9309 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4656147. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Stuart) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-307NOTICE of Appearance by Colby Mims May on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (May, Colby) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-318ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 31, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-01MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Craig L. Parshall, in order for him to appear as co-counsel for Plaintiff, contingent on said attorney filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than SEPTEMBER 12, 2016. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/1/2016. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-01MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin P. Sisney, in order for him to appear as co-counsel for Plaintiff, contingent on said attorney filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than SEPTEMBER 12, 2016. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/1/2016. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-029RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/31/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/30/2016. (May, Colby) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-0210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/01/2016. (May, Colby) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-0211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/1/2016 (May, Colby) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-0212LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sekulow, Jay) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-0213NOTICE of Declaration Certifying Personal Familiarity With the Local Rules of This Court, pursuant to Court Order of September 1, 2016 by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-0714NOTICE of Declaration Certifying Personal Familiarity With the Local Rules of This Court, pursuant to Court Order of September 1, 2016 by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Parshall, Craig) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-3015NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Leon Drezner on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-09-3016ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-0317ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report no later than OCTOBER 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/3/2016. (lcckk3) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2016. (dot) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-3118Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-03MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that Defendant intends to make an initial production of responsive documents to Plaintiff by December 28, 2016, and then make additional rolling productions every six weeks thereafter. At the parties' request, the Court ORDERS the parties to file an initial Joint Status Report indicating the status of these productions by no later than December 30, 2016. The parties shall file additional Joint Status Reports every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/3/2016. (lcckk3) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/30/2016. (dot) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-12-3019Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Sekulow, Jay) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-03-2920Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Sekulow, Jay) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-1221NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail A. Southerland on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-06-2822Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-09-2623Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-11-02Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the recent assignment of this case to Judge McFadden, the parties are advised that the pre-existing schedule for this case remains in effect. The parties shall comply with all deadlines as previously ordered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/16/2017. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-16ENTERED IN ERROR...MINUTE ORDER: In light of the recent assignment of this case to Judge McFadden, the parties are advised that the pre-existing schedule for this case remains in effect. The parties shall comply with all deadlines as previously ordered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/16/2017. (lctnm1) Modified on 11/16/2017. (hmc) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-16NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The second Minute Order entered on 11/16/2017, regarding the pre-existing schedule, was entered in error as a duplicate order. The parties shall disregard the entry. (hmc) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-12-2924Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2018-03-3025Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-2026STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/20/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-06-2727Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-08-3028NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia F. Summers on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Summers, Olivia) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-2629Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-10-0330NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Leon Drezner (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-12-2131Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-03MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' 31 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall file a Joint Status Report or before January 31, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/3/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-0832Unopposed MOTION to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-08ORDER granting 32 Unopposed Motion to Stay. Upon considering the Defendant's 32 Motion to Stay, it is hereby ordered that this matter shall be stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is further ordered that the Defendant will notify the Court immediately upon resumption of appropriations. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/8/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-2833NOTICE by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-28MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby lifts the stay in this case. The parties are further ORDERED to file a status report, including a proposed production schedule, on or before February 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/28/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-0134Consent MOTION to Modify Production Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER granting in part 34 Consent Motion to Modify Production Schedule. Defendant shall make its next production on or before March 6, 2019. Defendant shall continue to make productions of such records every six weeks, until production is complete. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report every 60 days, with the next such Joint Status Report to be filed on or before April 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's next production due by 3/6/2019, and every six weeks thereafter. Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2019, and every 60 days thereafter. (hmc) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-04-0135Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-05-3136Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 36 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before June 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/3/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/28/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-2837Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 37 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before July 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/1/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-08MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on August 5, 2019 at 10 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/8/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-09Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference scheduled for 8/5/2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (tg) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-1838Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Motion to Continue Status Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that the previously scheduled August 5, 2019 Status Conference is rescheduled to Wednesday, August 21, 2019 at 10 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/19/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-19Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference rescheduled to 8/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-2939Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 39 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before September 23, 2019. It is also ORDERED that the previously scheduled August 21, 2019 Status Conference is rescheduled to September 30, 2019 at 10 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/29/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2019. Status Conference rescheduled to 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar