Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01755
Date Filed2016-08-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffFREEDOM WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionFreedom Watch submitted FOIA requests to the FBI and the Office of the Attorney General for records concerning the agency's decision not to prosecute Hillary Clinton for misuse of a private email server while she was Secretary of State. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Freedom Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS Record/Information Dissemination Section
DefendantOFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL Office of Information Policy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-301COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4656688) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-30Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-012SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-01ELECTRONIC SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (SUMMONS NOT FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-023REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC..(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-064SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as U.S. Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff