Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01782
Date Filed2016-09-06
Date Closed2017-06-26
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice's Tax Division for records concerning communications between Eileen Shatz and any DOJ attorney detailed to the White House. Cause of Action also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and the parties had some contact concerning the processing of the request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-061COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4662963) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3, # 4 Exhibit Ex 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons DOJ, # 7 Summons Atty Gen, # 8 Summons Clerk)(Smith, Julie) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-06Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sth) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-062NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Mulvey on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-063LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-074REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE.(Smith, Julie) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-085SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-096NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/12/2016 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-158RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/12/2016. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-159RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/14/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/14/2016. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-1910NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-10-1711ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-18MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before November 2, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/18/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/2/2016 (tj) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-10-2712NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Jeremy Hagerman on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hagerman, Richard) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-10-3113PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULE) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-10-3114NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney Damon William Taaffe terminated. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-10-31MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint status report on or before December 12, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/31/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-12-1215Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before March 13, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/12/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2017-03-1316Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before April 21, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/13/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/21/2017 (tj) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-04-2117Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before May 19, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/24/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/19/2017 (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-1918Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before June 2, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/20/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/20/2017)
2017-06-0119Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01SCHEDULING MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their motions for summary judgment, if any, on or before July 7, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file their oppositions, if any, on or before July 28, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall limit their briefing to the question set forth in 19 Joint Status Report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/1/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 7/7/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/28/2017. (hs) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-2620STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff