Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. U.S. Department Of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2016cv07020
Date Filed2016-09-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis A. Kaplan
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice. The first request was for the report of an interagency task force on detainee disposition. The agency told Savage that the report was the subject of litigation by the International Counsel Bureau representing detainees and the agency would not be able to respond until January 2016. The ICB litigation was dismissed, but the agency had not responded to Savage's request by the time he filed suit. Savage's second request was for a report concerning the wireless surveillance program during the Bush administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but had not responded by the time Savage filed suit. His third request was made to the FBI for unreleased documents pertaining to orders from the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court identified by Judge John Bates in rulings he made in 2011. That request had not been responded to by the time the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-081COMPLAINT against U.S. Department Of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12737195)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-082CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-083RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-084REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-095ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department Of Justice. (rch) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-09CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (rch) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-09Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (rch) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-09Case Designated ECF. (rch) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-206NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Tulis on behalf of U.S. Department Of Justice. (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-10-117ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department Of Justice.(Tulis, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2017-01-068NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian MacDougall on behalf of Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (MacDougall, Ian) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-03-109ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David E. McCraw dated 3/8/2017 re: Request for extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: Henceforth, matters like this shall be presented by stipulation signed by all parties. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/10/2017) (cla) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-06-1510STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties to the above-captioned action, through their respective counsel, that the remaining deadlines for defendant U.S. Department of Justice's ("the Government's") processing of documents responsive to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA") requests at issue in this case in the schedule previously endorsed by the Court (Dkt. No. 9) are amended as follows, subject to the consent of the Court: By June 15, 2017, the Government will provide an interim response to the request for records from the docket of a particular Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court case (the "FISC Request"). By September 1, 2017, the Government will provide another interim response to the FISC Request. By October 1, 2017, the Government will provide a final response to the FISC Request. By October 15, 2017, the parties will submit a status report to the Court. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/15/2017) (ap) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff