Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIn re Sealed Docket Sheet Associated with Malware Warrant Issued on July 22, 2013
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2016cv03029
Date Filed2016-08-29
Date Closed2016-11-28
JudgeJudge James K. Bredar
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Maryland
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland
DefendantIndividuals
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-08-291MOTION to Unseal Court Docket Sheet by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland. Responses due by 9/15/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Filing Fee Paid, Receipt 14637092007)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-09-022MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathan Freed Wessler (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6217757.) by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland (Rocah, David) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-023MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brett Max Kaufman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6217791.) by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland (Rocah, David) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-074QC NOTICE: 2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-075QC NOTICE: 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-076CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brett Max Kaufman by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland. The fee has already been paid.(Rocah, David) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-077CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nathan Freed Wessler by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland. The fee has already been paid.(Rocah, David) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-098PAPERLESS ORDER granting 6 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brett Max Kaufman. Directing attorney Brett Max Kaufman to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-099PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nathan Freed Wessler. Directing attorney Nathan Freed Wessler to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2016. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-2210ORDER directing the Government to file a response to motion by October 15, 2016. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/21/2016. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m to Rod Rosenstein 9/22/16) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-09-3011MOTION for Extension of Time to file reply brief and to hold oral argument by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland, American Civil Liberties Union of Maryland Responses due by 10/17/2016 (Kaufman, Brett) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-0312PAPERLESS ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time : The Government's Response to ACLU Motion is now due 11/1/16; ACLU's Reply due 12/1/16. The 10/28/16 hearing date is VACATED. The MOTIONS HEARING is now set in for 1/5/17 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/30/2016. (vdcs, Chambers) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-0613NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Noel O'Malley on behalf of Unknown Individuals (O'Malley, Kristi) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
2016-11-0114Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 MOTION to Unseal until November 4, 2016 by Unknown Individuals(O'Malley, Kristi) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-0115PAPERLESS ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 1 MOTION to Unseal. Responses due by 11/4/2016. Replies due by 11/18/2016. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 11/1/2016. (bpgs, Chambers) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-0416(FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL)RESPONSE to Motion re 1 MOTION to Unseal Docket Sheet filed by Unknown Individuals.(O'Malley, Kristi) Modified on 11/4/2016 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-0417RESPONSE to Motion re 1 MOTION to Unseal Docket Sheet - CORRECTED filed by Unknown Individuals.(O'Malley, Kristi) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-2818ORDER finding as moot 1 Motion to Unseal Court Docket Sheet. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 11/28/2016. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff