Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRojas v. Federal Aviation Administration et al
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityPhoenix Division
Case Number2:2016cv03067
Date Filed2016-09-09
Date Closed2019-09-03
JudgeChief Judge G Murray Snow
PlaintiffJorge Alejandro Rojas
DefendantFederal Aviation Administration
DefendantUnited States Department of Transportation named as Department of Transportation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [26]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in Arizona has ruled that the FAA failed to show that personally-identifying information in records pertaining to complaints submitted as result of a change in its policy to no longer give preference to students participating in specified college programs under the Qualified Applicant Register was protected by either Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) or Exemption 7(A) interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Jorge Rojas, who was in such a program studying to become an air traffic controller, filed a number of requests to the agency. The court agreed that the agency had properly issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records for Rojas' requests concerning complaints filed against named individuals. But the court rejected the agency's use of Exemption 6 more broadly to protect generic personal information. Addressing a spreadsheet listing EEO complaints, the court noted that "the disclosure of subject lines, case numbers, and attachment titles will not likely allow Mr. Rojas or any other observer to identify individual claimants." The court added that "any potential privacy interest in the redacted portions are trivial at best, and as such, the Court does not address the public interest in obtaining this information." As to an allegation that identifying information contained in a complaint alleging cheating in hiring practices, the court found the public interest outweighed any privacy interest. Here, the court pointed out that "the public has an interest in knowing information about hiring officials who unfairly support specific job applicants, especially for positions that maintain public safety."
Issues: Exemption 6 - Invasion of privacy, Exemption 7(A) - Interference with ongoing investigation
Opinion/Order [90]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-091COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13378328 filed by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (submitted by Michael Pearson) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibits 6-41, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(REW) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-092SUMMONS Submitted by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (submitted by Michael Pearson) (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(REW) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-093Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13378328. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-3067-PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions)(REW) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-124Summons Issued as to Federal Aviation Administration, Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(REW). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-155*Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified on 9/16/2016 to Correct text from Agreement to Magistrate Judge to Election to District Judge; NEF regenerated (MAP)/(SCH). (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-166MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-16-3067-PHX-GMS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-167ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 12/9/2016. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/16/2016. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-168SCHEDULING ORDER (FOIA): See attached Order for deadlines and details. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant(s) with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/16/2016. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-10-109SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alejandro Rojas: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons & Magistrate Elec Form upon Federal Aviation Administration on 10/05/2016. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
2016-10-1010SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jorge Alejandro Rojas: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons & Magistrate Elec Form upon Department of Transportation on 9/19/2016. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
2016-10-1711ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation.(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2017-03-0912MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-0913STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 12 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Bullis, Paul) *Modified linkage on 3/10/2017 (DXD). (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-1014NOTICE re: Filing Signed Declaration by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re: 13 Statement of Facts . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-04-0415MOTION (Stipulated) to Enlarge Page Requirement for Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-0416IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting 15 the Stipulated Motion to Enlarge Page Requirement for Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by 3 pages, up to 20 pages. Ordered by Judge G. Murray Snow.(GMS, ag)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-1017RESPONSE to Motion re: 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1018STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 17 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-2119First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-2120ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment 19 . The deadline for filing Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 12 is extended to and including 5/15/2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/21/2017.(LMR) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-05-1221Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-1622ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Motion 21 . The deadline for filing Defendants' reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 12 ) shall be May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/16/17.(SLQ) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
2017-05-2623REPLY to Response to Motion re: 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-2624* Joint MOTION for Leave to File SurReply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 6/27/2017 (LAD). (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-2725IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying 24 the Motion for Leave to File SurReply. The Court will disregard new matters raised for the first time by the government in its reply. Ordered by Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-12-0426ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 12 ) is granted in part and denied in part.... Status Hearing set for 1/5/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/4/17. (LAD) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2018-01-0527MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 1/5/2018. The FAA shall provide all documents by 2/16/2018. If the FAA has the agreement of plaintiff, they may redact documents that do not pertain to the information in which plaintiff is interested, but those documents must be provided by 2/16/2018. Plaintiff has until 2/23/2018 to inform the Court whether or not this action can be dismissed, whether or not enforcement action needs to be taken against the FAA, or other relief. APPEARANCES: Michael Pearson for Plaintiff, who is also present. Paul Bullis for Defendants. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 9:37 AM to 9:53 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-02-1628First MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Documents to Plaintiff (Unopposed) by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-02-2129ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Documents to Plaintiff 28 is granted. The deadline for Defendants to provide documents to Plaintiff in response to FOIA Request 9570 pursuant to this Court's Order 27 , is extended until March 9, 2018. Defendants will provide Plaintiff, by March 9, 2018, with a declaration detailing and describing the search performed, along with an explanation of the reasons why records were identified as potentially responsive and then later found not responsive. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to inform this Court whether this action may be dismissed is extended until March 16, 2018. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/21/2018. (REK) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-03-1630STATUS REPORT by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-2131ORDER setting a Status Conference for 4/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/21/18. (EJA) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-2332NOTICE of Errata re: 30 Report - Status by Plaintiff Jorge Alejandro Rojas.. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-3033*MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment, RESPONSE re: 30 Report - Status by Defendants Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibits 1-14: Declarations, # 3 Exhibit 15: Vaughn Index I, # 4 Exhibit 16: Vaughn Index II, # 5 Exhibit 17: March 29, 2018 Letter to Plaintiff, # 6 March 30, 2018 Letter to Plaintiff)(Bullis, Paul) *Modified to correct event on 4/2/2018 (REK). (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-0334RESPONSE to Motion re: 33 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-0435*Motion deemed moot per 39 LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT - Notice and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Statement of Facts by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re: 33 MOTION for Leave to File . (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Index, # 3 Exhibit 1, Attachments A-F, # 4 Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Bullis, Paul) Modified on 4/5/2018 (SLQ). Modified on 9/3/2019 (REK). (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-0636Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 33 MOTION for Leave to File by Defendants Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Harnetta R. Williams)(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-0637MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 4/6/2018. FAA has 30 days to comply with supplemental disclosure of documents as set forth on the record. Plaintiff shall have 15 days thereafter to file a Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Sanctions. APPEARANCES: Michael Pearson for Plaintiff, who is also present. Paul Bullis for Defendant. Russell Christensen is also present. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 9:55 AM to 10:06 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-1138TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation for proceedings held on April 6, 2018, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-1839Pursuant to discussions at the status conference on April 6, 2018, IT IS ORDERED finding 33 the Motion for Leave to File moot. Ordered by Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-1940NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings held on 04/06/2018, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Charlotte A. Powers). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2018. (RAP) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-05-0741NOTICE re: Supplemental Production as required by Court Order [Doc. 37] by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re: 37 Status Conference,,, Common Prompts (Text Only),, . (Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-2242*MOTION for Order to Show Cause, MOTION for Sanctions by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael). *Added MOTION for Sanctions on 5/23/2018 (REK). (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-0543RESPONSE to Motion re: 42 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Sanctions filed by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-0644TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jorge Alejandro Rojas for proceedings held on 4/6/18, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-1245REPLY to Response to Motion re: 42 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-08-1446JUDICIAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Judge G. Murray Snow for Status Conference proceedings held on 01/05/2018, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-1447NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings held on 01/05/2018, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Charlotte A. Powers). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. (RAP) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-1548ORDER granting 42 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Defendant FAA shall show cause why it should not be held in civil contempt for purported violations of this Court's Orders. FURTHER ORDERED Show Cause Hearing set for 8/24/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge G Murray Snow. FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties must promptly meet and confer in good faith in an attempt to resolve the current disputes without judicial intervention. The Parties shall certify to the Court when they have done so and report on the outcome of such talks. If, after conferring, the necessity for a show-cause hearing becomes moot, the Court will vacate the August 24, 2018 hearing. See Order for Further Details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/15/18. (MAP) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-1649TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation for proceedings held on January 5, 2018, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-1650TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jorge Alejandro Rojas for proceedings held on 1/5/18, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-1652*( DUPLICATE FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT AT DOC. 47 ) - NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings held on 01/05/2018, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Charlotte A. Powers). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (RAP) *Modified to reference duplication on 8/22/2018 (RAP). (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2151MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-2253ORDER granting Plaintiff's 51 Motion to Continue Show Cause Hearing. Show Cause Hearing reset for 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties shall continue to confer in good faith in an attempt to resolve the current disputes without judicial intervention. The Parties shall report on the outcome of such talks by September 28, 2018. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/22/2018. (ATD) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-09-1954Joint MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing (Currently set for Oct. 5, 2018) by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-1955ORDER granting 54 Motion to Continue Show Cause Hearing. The Show Cause Hearing currently set for October 5, 2018 is vacated and reset for October 26, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. The Parties shall report on the outcome of good faith talks to resolve the current disputes without judicial intervention (Doc. 53 by October 19, 2018. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/19/18. (MSA) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-10-1956STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-2257ORDER: The OSC Hearing currently set for October 26, 2018 is vacated. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties jointly file a Status Report on or before November 16, 2018. The Court shall thereafter determine whether Defendants must provide the list of individuals responsible for the withholding of documents and whether any further action will be required of them. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/22/18. (EJA) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-1658STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-2059ORDER re: 58 Joint Status Report - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants shall provide the supplemental productions in this matter by December 7, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint report regarding the remaining issues in this action by January 4, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/20/18. (LAD) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-12-2660MOTION to Stay Due to Federal Government Shutdown by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-0461*STATUS REPORT and RESPONSE to 60 Defendant's Motion to Stay by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) *Modified to add linkage on 1/7/2019 (EJA). (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-0962NOTICE of Errata re: 61 Report - Status by Plaintiff Jorge Alejandro Rojas.. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-1163ORDER denying 60 Motion to Stay. See Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/11/19. (SJF) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-2464ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a notice and form order outlining a proposed remedy for the FAA's non-compliance with the Court's November Order 59 . Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/24/2019. (REK) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-2865STATUS REPORT by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-2866NOTICE re: Proposed Remedy for Defendants' Failure to Comply by Jorge Alejandro Rojas . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-3067ORDER that the parties will confer and file a Joint Status Report on February 28, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/30/2019. (REK) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-2868STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. (Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-0669ORDER setting a Status Conference for 3/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/5/19. (EJA) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-2070MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Status Conference held on 3/20/2019. The FAA shall, within one week, provide specific completion dates to Plaintiff for all outstanding materials in the FOIA request. The FAA shall further identify to the Court the individual or individuals within the FAA who is/are responsible for responding to the Plaintiffs' FOIA requests. APPEARANCES: Michael Pearson for Plaintiff. Paul Bullis for Defendants. Sarah Leavitt, Office of General Counsel at the FAA is also present. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 10:37 AM to 10:51 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-2171TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Federal Aviation Administration for proceedings held on March 20, 2019, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Bullis, Paul) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2172TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jorge Alejandro Rojas for proceedings held on 3/20/19, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2173NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings held on 03/20/2019, before Chief Judge G. MURRAY SNOW. [Court Reporter: Charlotte A. Powers, RMR, FCRR, CRR, CSR, CMRS, Telephone number (602) 322-7250]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2019. (RAP) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-2774*NOTICE re: Providing Estimated Completion Dates by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re: 70 Status Conference, Common Prompts (Text Only) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Estimated Completion Dates, # 2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Geraldine Gour)(Bullis, Paul) *Modified to add additional filer on 3/28/2019 (REK). (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-2875NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Kristina L. Morrison appearing for Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation. Attorney Paul Arthur Bullis terminated. . (Morrison, Kristina) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-0576ORDER - Plaintiff shall within 7 days of the date of this Order file a notice with the Court detailing whether he objects in any way to the Notice of Estimated Completion Dates (Doc. 74 ). See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/5/19. (DXD) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-1077NOTICE re: and Objection to Defendants' Notice of Providing Estimated Completion Dates by Jorge Alejandro Rojas re: 74 Notice (Other) . (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-1778ORDER - Pursuant to Plaintiff's request for a stay in its Notice and Objection to Defendants' Notice of Providing Estimated Completion Dates (Doc. 77 ) and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting a stay of the deadline established in the Court's previous Order (Doc. 76 ) for a motion for referral to the Office of Special Counsel. If the Court grants an application by Plaintiff for attorneys' fees in this matter, Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of that order to file a motion for referral to the Office of Special Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/17/19. (SLQ) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-05-0179Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-0680ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff may, if he so chooses, file a motion regarding his disagreement with Defendants' estimated completion dates (if needed) and/or a motion for sanctions by 6/14/2019. Any Response to such a motion by Defendants' shall be filed no later than 30 days from the filing of Plaintiff's motion. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/3/19. (DXD) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-06-1481MOTION re Estimated Completion Dates by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-1482*WITHDRAWN per 88 *MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael). *Added MOTION for Order to Show Cause on 6/17/2019 (REK). Modified on 7/22/2019 (REK). (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-2883NOTICE re: Settlement Efforts (Joint) by Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation re: 80 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document . (Morrison, Kristina) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-1184*Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (Partial) by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael) *Modified to correct event on 7/12/2019 (REK). (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-1585*RESPONSE in Opposition re: 81 MOTION re Estimated Completion Dates filed by United States Department of Transportation, Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit A-F, # 3 Exhibit G-L, # 4 Exhibit M-N)(Morrison, Kristina) *Modified to add additional filer on 7/16/2019 (REK). (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1786First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Motion re Estimated Completion Dates (Unopposed) by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-1887ORDER: Having reviewed Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply In Support of Motion re Estimated Completion Dates (Doc. 86 ) and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion. Plaintiff shall file any Reply In Support of Motion re Estimated Completion Dates (Doc. 81 ) on or before August 5, 2019. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/18/2019. (SST) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-2288ORDER: The Joint Notice of Stipulation of Partial Dismissal is granted in part and denied in part. This matter will not be dismissed until the Court has ruled on Plaintiff's Motion Re Estimated Completion Dates 81 . The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 82 , as having been withdrawn by Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/22/2019. (REK) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-08-0589REPLY to Response to Motion re: 81 MOTION re Estimated Completion Dates filed by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-2690ORDER: Plaintiff Jorge Alejandro Rojas' Motion Re Estimated Completion Dates (Doc. 81 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file, within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, a joint report outlining whether, after the parties' Joint Notice of Stipulation of Partial Dismissal (Doc. 84 ) and this Order, any issues remain in this action. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/26/2019. (SST) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-09-0391STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Jorge Alejandro Rojas. (Pearson, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-0392ORDER that this Court shall maintain jurisdiction over this matter to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/03/2019. (REK) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar