Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01833
Date Filed2016-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records referenced in the public portions of the Senate Intelligence Committee's report on the use of torture. The CIA acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-131COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4672886) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons CIA, # 4 Summons USAO)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-132AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-13Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-154GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/15/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/15/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/15/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/15/2016.) (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 9/19/2016 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-10-247NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-248Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-25MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before 11/14/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/25/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-11-149ANSWER to 2 Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Related document: 2 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-14MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 12/2/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/14/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-12-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-02MINUTE ORDER. Based on the parties' representations in their 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Defendant shall complete processing of documents already being processed for public release and shall make an interim release of responsive, nonexempt material by 3/2/2017; Defendant shall complete processing of all responsive material by 12/1/2017; the parties shall file a further status report by 12/22/2017, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/2/2016. (lckbj3) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff