Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSeife v. U.S. Department of Treasury
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2016cv07271
Date Filed2016-09-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Laura Taylor Swain
PlaintiffCharles Seife
Case DescriptionCharles Seife, a journalism professor at New York University, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury for records concerning three on-background briefings to the press conducted in 2012, 2013, and 2014. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Seife contacted the agency several times for a date of completion estimate, but after the agency failed to provide a substantive response to his request, Seife filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-181COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Treasury. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12771097)Document filed by Charles Seife.(Bahr, David) (Entered: 09/18/2016)
2016-09-182MOTION for David A. Bahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12771100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Charles Seife. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting PHV)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 09/18/2016)
2016-09-183CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 09/18/2016)
2016-09-184REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Treasury, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles Seife. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 09/18/2016)
2016-09-19***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Alan Bahr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pc) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-19CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-19Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (pc) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-19Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-195ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Treasury. (pc) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-19>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 2 MOTION for David A. Bahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12771100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-19NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Jesse M. Furman is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-286INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/15/2016 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/28/2016) (cf) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-10-127AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. U.S. Department of Treasury served on 9/28/2016, answer due 11/28/2016. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Charles Seife. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-138NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Jan-Huan Sun on behalf of U.S. Department of Treasury. (Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-179AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against U.S. Department of Treasury.Document filed by Charles Seife. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Charles Seife.(Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-18***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Alan Bahr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Department of Treasury. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (dgo) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-10-3110LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 10/31/2016., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 10/31/2016. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-0211ORDER granting 10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The foregoing extension request is Granted and the proposed schedule is approved. The Conference is adjourned to February 17, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. and the related deadlines and requirements are suspended pending further order of the Court. DE #10 resolved. SO ORDERED. United States Department of Treasury answer due 11/30/2016; granting 10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Initial Conference set for 2/17/2017 at 10:15 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/01/2016) (ama) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-3012ANSWER to 9 Amended Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-12-0913LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 12/9/2016. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-1214ORDER granting 13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. (Accordingly, Treasury respectfully requests that the Court grant an extension until Wednesday, December 14, 2016, for Treasury to make its second production.) The requested extension is Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/12/2016) (ama) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2017-01-2715LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 1/27/2017 re: status report. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-3016MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 15 Letter filed by United States Department of Treasury. (Request of additional seven (7) days to submit the status report and possible briefing schedule, would be on February 10, 2017. In addition, the parties request that counsel for Plaintiff - who is in Oregon - be permitted to appear at the Court's February 17, 2017, conference by telephone. ). ENDORSEMENT: The foregoing request are Granted. Mr. Bahr must contact the courtroom deputy (212) 805-0417 for dial-in instructions by February 15, 2017. DE # 15 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/30/2017) (ama) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-1017LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Plaintiff's Counsel David Bahr dated 2/10/17 re: status report and request to adjourn initial conference set for February 17, 2017. Document filed by Charles Seife.(Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-1318MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 17 Letter filed by Charles Seife. ENDORSEMENT: The requested extension of time is Granted. The February 17, 2017, conference is adjourned to March 16, 2017, at 10:15 AM. DE # 17 resolved. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 3/16/2017 at 10:15 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/10/2017) (ama) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-2219LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 2/22/2017 re: joint status update. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-2220MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 19 Letter filed by United States Department of Treasury. (Accordingly, the parties respectfully request that the deadline for submitting the status update be adjourned from February 24, 2017, to March 3, 2017. The parties do not currently anticipate needing to adjourn the March 16, 2017, conference with the Court). ENDORSEMENT: The adjournment request is Granted. DE # 19 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/22/2017) (ama) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-0321LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 3/3/2017 re: status update and March 16, 2017, pre-trial conference. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-0622MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 21 Letter filed by United States Department of Treasury. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 16, 2017, is adjourned to May 12, 2017, at 10:15 AM. The parties must file their status report by April 28, 2017. ( Initial Conference set for 5/12/2017 at 10:15 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/6/2017) (mro) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-2223ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 2 Motion for David A. Bahr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/21/2017) (ap) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-04-1224LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 4/12/2017 re: status update re productions and conference. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-1725MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 24 Letter filed by United States Department of Treasury. ENDORSEMENT: The revised schedule is approved. The conference is adjourned to June 2, 2017, at 11:00 am. Plaintiff's counsel may participate by telephone, and must contact the Courtroom Deputy (212-805-0424) for instructions at least 48 hours prior to the conference. DE #24 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 6/2/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/17/2017) (anc) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-06-0126LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 6/1/2017 re: status update re 6/2/2017 conference. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
2017-06-0227MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 26 Letter filed by United States Department of Treasury. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to August 4, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. The parties must file a status report by July 28, 2017. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 8/4/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/01/2017) (ama) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-07-2828LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 7/28/2017 re: status update. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-07-3129MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 28 Letter filed by United States Department of Treasury. ENDORSEMENT: The Conference is adjourned to September 29, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. The parties must provide a written status report by September 22, 2017. DE # 28 resolved. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 9/29/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/31/2017) (ama) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-09-2230LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Anthony J. Sun dated 9/22/2017 re: status update. Document filed by United States Department of Treasury.(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
2017-09-2631MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 30 Letter filed by United States Department of Treasury. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to November 3, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. and the related deadlines are modified accordingly. DE # 30 resolved. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 11/3/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/25/2017) (ama) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff