Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGUARDIAN NEWS & MEDIA LIMITED v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01869
Date Filed2016-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffGUARDIAN NEWS & MEDIA LIMITED
Case DescriptionThe Guardian submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning individuals associated with protests of the Keystone Pipeline project. The agency split the Guardian's request into 18 separate requests. It administratively closed 17 of the Guardian's requests, leaving only one request open. The Guardian then resubmitted 18 requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing further from the agency, the Guardian filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-191COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4679405) filed by GUARDIAN NEWS & MEDIA LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Department of Justice, # 4 Summons USAO)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-192LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUARDIAN NEWS & MEDIA LIMITED (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-20Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-204GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/20/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/27/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/27/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/27/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/27/2016.) (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-10-256NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-257Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-26MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 1/6/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/26/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2017-01-058NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robert Charles Merritt, III on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Marsha W. Yee (Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-069ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-0610NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney Marsha Wellknown Yee terminated. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 1/20/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/6/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-2311Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-24MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations made in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 3/24/2017, the parties shall file a further status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/24/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-03-2412Joint STATUS REPORT by GUARDIAN NEWS & MEDIA LIMITED. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-27MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations made in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 4/3/2017, the parties shall file a further status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/27/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-04-0313Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-05MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) The FBI shall process for production/withholding a minimum of 600 pages of potentially responsive records and make an interim production of non-exempt records that are subject to FOIA and responsive to Plaintiff's 2016 FOIA Requests on or before 6/1/2017; (2) Following the 6/1/2017 production, the FBI shall process for production/withholding 500 pages of potentially responsive records per month until the FBI has processed all records responsive to Plaintiff's 2016 FOIA Requests. The FBI shall make interim production of non-exempt records that are subject to FOIA and responsive to Plaintiff's 2016 FOIA Requests on or before the first day of every month, beginning on 7/1/2017; and (3) The parties shall file joint status reports, to include the FBI's progress conducting cross-reference searches for Plaintiff's requested search items, every 30 days. The first such status report shall be filed by no later than 6/8/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/05/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-06-0814Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Merritt, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff