Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01887
Date Filed2016-09-21
Date Closed2016-11-14
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys and the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Western District of Texas for records concerning a July 22 meeting held at the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Western District of Texas pertaining to Judicial Watch and several of its employees. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4681907) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. DOJ)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-212LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-21Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (dr) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(dr) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
2016-09-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/29/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/29/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/27/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/27/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-10-045NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-286ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-11-027STANDING ORDER. The parties are directed to read this Order in its entirety. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/2/2016. (lcegs1) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order For Further Proceedings due by 11/16/2016. (mac) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: OIG Notice To The Court due by 11/9/2016. NCBS To Inform The Court And The Parties Of A Reasonable Deadline due by 12/1/2016. (mac) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-128STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/12/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff