Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01898
Date Filed2016-09-23
Date Closed2016-10-25
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Diversity Management and Equal Opportunity at the Department of Defense for records concerning teaching materials provided by the Office for use in Equal Opportunity training throughout the department. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-231COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4685230) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons Department of Defense)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-26Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (dr) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(dr) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-10-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/4/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/3/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/4/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/3/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-195NOTICE of Appearance by Derrick Wayne Grace on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Grace, Derrick) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-256NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff