Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01899
Date Filed2016-09-23
Date Closed2017-02-22
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Community Relations Service at the Department of Justice for records concerning contacts CRS had with Black Lives Matter. After hearing nothing from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4685250) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (md) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-26SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (EACH OF THE FOIA SUMMONS ARE INCOMPLETE. THE SUMMONS ARE BLANK WITH NO INFORMATION ON THEM) (zmd) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-263REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-264REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-265REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-276GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/27/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-287SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-10-048RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/4/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/3/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/4/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/4/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-269NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-2710Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-10-2711Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-11-07MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 10 , 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before by 12/6/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/7/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-12-0612Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-07MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, nunc pro tunc. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 12/13/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/7/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-1313ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 1/4/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/13/16. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2017-01-0314Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Schedule by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-03MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Schedule is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure on or before 1/13/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on January 3, 2017. (lckbj2) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-1215Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' representations in their 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant must complete its search for responsive records and inform Plaintiff of how many responsive pages exist on or before February 1, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings on or before February 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on January 17, 2017. (lckbj2) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-02-0816Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-10MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations made in the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 3/15/2017, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 02/10/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-2117STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff