Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01914
Date Filed2016-09-27
Date Closed2017-02-23
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense and the CIA concerning the alleged torture of American prisoners while incarcerated in Cuba. The Defense Department acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-271COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4688954) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Defense)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-272LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-27Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-294REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-305SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (jf) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/4/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/3/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/4/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/3/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-11-037ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Young, Danielle) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-04MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before December 2, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/4/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-228Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file a dispositive motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Danielle) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-23MINUTE ORDER granting defendant CIA's 8 unopposed motion for an extension of time. Defendant CIA's dispositive motion, or its status report setting forth the schedule for the completion of the production of documents, shall be filed by December 21, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/23/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2016-12-029Unopposed STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Danielle) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of the status report filed by defendants, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 24, 2017, to update the Court on the status of the review, and to propose a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. The Minute Order dated November 23, 2016, which required the CIA to file a separate status report by December 21, 2016, is VACATED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/5/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-05Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 1/24/2017, to update the Court on the status of the review, and to propose a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. (ad) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2017-01-2410Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-24MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 10 status report, the parties shall file a joint status report by April 18, 2017, if the matter has not been voluntarily dismissed by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/24/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-02-2311STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff