Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv01928
Date Filed2016-09-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Energy & Environment Legal Institute submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the Ramazzini Institute, an Italian think tank sometimes consulted by federal agencies. The agency asked EELI to narrow the scope of its request. EELI did so. The agency then granted EELI's fee waiver request. But after hearing nothing further the agency, EELI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-09-291COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4691352) filed by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons To Attorney General, # 3 Summons To US Attorney, # 4 Summons To Environmental Protection Agency)(Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-292Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENERGY & ENVIRONMENT LEGAL INSTITUTE. (Mandelbaum, Chaim) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-29Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (dr) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(dr) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-10-174NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-11-045Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-13MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Joint Motion for Stay of These Proceedings. In light of the parties' representations regarding a resolution of the FOIA request at issue here, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned case is stayed until 1/12/2017. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report by 1/5/2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/13/2016. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 11/13/2016)
2016-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2017. (tb) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2017-01-056Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-097ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is ORDERED that this case is STAYED until March 9, 2017; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, if a stipulation of dismissal has not yet been filed, the parties shall file by March 6, 2017 another joint status report, to report on the progress of EPA's review, and to propose a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/8/2017. (jth) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
2017-03-068Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-099ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is ORDERED that this case is STAYED until June 5, 2017; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, if a stipulation of dismissal has not yet been filed, the parties shall file by June 2, 2017 another joint status report, to report on the progress of EPA's review, and to propose a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/8/2017. (jth) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-06-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-07-0611Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-09-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-2013ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12] Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that defendant's summary judgment motion due by 11/2/2017. Response due by 12/1/2017. Reply due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/20/17. (tb) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-21MINUTE ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/21/17. (lcrjl3) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff