Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02027
Date Filed2016-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's decision to delete from its Youtube channel an exchange between Fox News Reporter James Rosen and State spokeswoman Jen Psaki regarding Iranian nuclear negotiations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4704516) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons State Department, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney Genearl)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-112LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-113NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Orfanedes on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-114NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 16-1679. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-11Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (md) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-135SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/17/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/16/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/17/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-11-167ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Kishore, Deepthy) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-178ORDER. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before December 16, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/17/16. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before 12/16/2016. (jth) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-12-169STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kishore, Deepthy) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of 9 defendant's status report, defendant shall produce its responsive, non-exempt records to plaintiff on a rolling basis with its first production by January 13, 2017. The parties must file a status report with the Court by January 18, 2017 to advise the Court of the status of defendant's productions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/23/2016. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2016-12-28Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are directed to file a Report with the Court by 1/18/2017 to advise of the status of defendant's productions. (jth) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
2017-01-1810Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kishore, Deepthy) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-19MINUTE ORDER. In light of 10 defendant's status report, defendant shall continue producing its responsive, non-exempt records to plaintiff on a rolling basis with its next production by February 13, 2017. The parties must file a status report with the Court by February 17, 2017 to advise the Court of the status of defendant's productions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/19/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-02-1711Joint STATUS REPORT Second Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of 11 the parties' joint status report, the parties must file a status report with the Court by March 17, 2017 to advise the Court of the status of defendant's productions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/20/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/20/2017)
2017-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties must file a Joint Report by 3/17/2017, to advise the Court of the Status of Defendant's productions. (jth) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-1712Third STATUS REPORT Third Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of 12 the parties' joint status report, the parties must file a status report with the Court by June 20, 2017 to advise the Court of the status of defendant's productions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/17/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties must file a Report by 6/20/2017, to advise the Court of the Status of Defendant's productions. (jth) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-06-2013Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kishore, Deepthy) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of 13 the parties' joint status report, the parties must file a status report with the Court by August 23, 2017 to advise the Court of the status of defendant's productions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/21/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-3014NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cesar A. Lopez-Morales on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Deepthy Kishore (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-08-2315Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-08-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of 15 the parties' joint status report, the parties must file a status report with the Court by November 21, 2017 to advise the Court of the status of defendant's productions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/23/2017. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
2017-11-01Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Amy Berman Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-21MINUTE ORDER: In light of the recent assignment of this case to Judge McFadden, the parties are advised that the pre-existing schedule for this case remains in effect. The parties shall comply with all deadlines as previously ordered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/21/2017. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-2116Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-22MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on February 19, 2018 updating the Court on the status of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's request, including the anticipated schedule for completion of its production of documents to Plaintiff. The parties shall also indicate whether the parties anticipate filing any motions for which the Court must enter a briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/22/2017. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/19/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff