Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2016cv03772
Date Filed2016-10-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Leigh Martin May
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Southeastern Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the schedules of two employees. The organization also asked for a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, SLF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-111COMPLAINT, filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.; filed and Summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-6747877.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -A, # 2 Exhibit -B, # 3 Exhibit -C, # 4 Exhibit - D, # 5 Exhibit --E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-112Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Environmental Protection Agency Loretta Lynch and U. S. Attorney Office - NDGA. (Attachments: # 1 Loretta Lynch, # 2 U. S. Attorney Office - NDGA)(eop) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-113Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (bdb) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-144STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/14/2016. (rvb) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-17Clerks Notation re 3 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-245AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Certificate of Interested Parties , as to U.S. EPA, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney NDGA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. EPA, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-11-166ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by United States Environmental Protection Agency. Discovery ends on 4/17/2017.(Amanti, Lena) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-12-157JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-228SCHEDULING ORDER Approving 7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/22/2016. (rvb) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-04-139STATUS REPORT by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hermann, Kimberly) Modified on 4/13/2017 to re-docket request for extension of time as Motion event (hfm). (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-1310Unopposed MOTION Leave of Absence May 2, 2017 to June 16, 2017 by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-1311MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(hfm) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-1312ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including August 16, 2017, to file Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/13/17. (hfm) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-04-1313ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave of Absence of Kimberly S. Hermann from May 2, 2017 to June 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/13/17. (hfm) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-08-0414Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Summary Judgment Deadline and Status Report with Brief In Support by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Amanti, Lena) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-0415ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment shall be extended for a period of four months, through December 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/4/2017. (rjs) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-10-0316Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 4, 5, 6, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 16, 17, 18, 19, and 20, 2017, by Lena Amanti. (Amanti, Lena) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-11-2217Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Summary Judgment Deadline Joint Status Report and Request to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline with Brief In Support by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Amanti, Lena) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-11-2218ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend Summary Judgment Deadline. The parties shall have through and including February 15, 2018 to file any motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/22/2017. (rvb) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff