Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02045
Date Filed2016-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State for records concerning the Tablighi Jamaat Project. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the request and Homeland Security further indicated that the request had been referred to U.S. Customs and Border Protection and the Office of Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Judicial Watch filed suit against both agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Office of the General Counsel
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-131COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4707422) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Dep't of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons Dep't of State, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Atty for the District of Columbia)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-13Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-143SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/21/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/20/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/21/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/17/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-11-185MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-21MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's 5 Motion, the Court ORDERS that it shall file such Opposition by November 23, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/21/2016. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-21Set/Reset Deadline: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's 5 Motion, the Court ORDERS that it shall file such Opposition by 11/23/2016. (ad) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-28MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 21, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/28/2016.(lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-28Set/Reset Deadline: Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before 12/21/2016. (ad) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-12-216ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Truong, John) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly propose a briefing schedule by January 4, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/21/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet, confer, and jointly propose a briefing schedule by 1/4/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-227MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Truong, John) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-27MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff opposes Defendants' 7 Motion for Extension, the Court ORDERS that it shall file such Opposition by December 30, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/27/2016. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2016-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 12/30/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2017-01-03MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly propose a briefing schedule by February 3, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/3/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall meet, confer, and jointly propose a briefing schedule by 2/3/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-178NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alexander Kenneth Haas on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney John C. Truong (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-02-039Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Haas, Alexander) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by March 17, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/3/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-2710NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Cuong Truong on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Alexander K. Haas (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-1711Joint STATUS REPORT (Second) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on April 28, 2017, to apprise the Court on the progress of this case and, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions and responses thereto. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/20/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/28/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-04-2512NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney John Truong (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-2513Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-25MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by June 2, 2017, to apprise the Court on the progress of this case and, if necessary, to offer a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions and responses thereto. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/25/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/2/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-1814Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
2017-05-19MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 7, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/19/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-05-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/7/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
2017-06-0615Joint STATUS REPORT (Fourth) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by July 7, 2017, to apprise the Court on the progress of this case and, if necessary, to offer a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/6/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-06-2916STIPULATION of Dismissal (as to Defendant U.S. Department of State) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-0617Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 26, 2017, which will include either a proposed schedule for the completion of any further search by DHS or a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/7/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
2017-07-2618Joint STATUS REPORT (Sixth) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 6, 2017, which will include an update regarding the completion of the search or a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/26/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
2017-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff