Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02046
Date Filed2016-10-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a request to the FBI for records concerning its investigation of Hillary Clinton's email server. The agency divided Judicial Watch's request into three separate requests. It then told Judicial Watch it was administratively closing one request because it was duplicative of the others. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal of the agency's decision to close its request. The agency subsequently told Judicial Watch it was processing all three requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4707475) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Dept. of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-10-13Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/14/2016) (zmd). (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/21/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/20/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/17/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 10/24/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-11-155Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-16MINUTE ORDER: Granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 7, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/16/16. (DJS) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/7/2016. (tth) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-12-076ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-07MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than 1/6/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/7/16. (DJS) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/6/2017 (zsm) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2017-01-067Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of the joint status report filed on 1/6/2017, a status conference is hereby set for Tuesday, 1/17/2017, at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/9/2017. (lctsc3) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
2017-01-12Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (tb) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-17Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 1/17/2017 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Parties will file a status report 90 days from today's hearing. Status Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Consistent with the court's ruling from the bench at the 1/17/17 Status Conference, the parties shall file a joint status report and proposed order by 4/17/17. Status Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/17/17. (DJS) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2017. (tb) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-04-178Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report filed on 4/17/17, as there do not appear to be any issues with production requiring the court's attention, the status set for 4/25/17 is hereby vacated. Parties shall file a Joint Status Report and proposed order on or before July 17, 2017 and the court will determine at that time if a status conference is necessary. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/19/2017. (lctsc3) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Order and Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-07-179Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-19MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 9 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by October 16, 2017. The parties are reminded that their report shall contain a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/19/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2017. (tb) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-10-1610Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-16MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 10 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by January 15, 2018 and every 90 days thereafter. To the extent the status report contains a proposed briefing schedule, the parties shall also submit a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/16/17. (DJS) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff