Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02074
Date Filed2016-10-18
Date Closed2017-10-18
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the ethics agreements made by former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton and certain members of her staff, as well as any waivers or exemptions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-181COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4712578) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons State Dept., # 7 Summons Atty. Gen., # 8 Summons Clerk)(Vecchione, John) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-10-182Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-10-18Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (jd) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-193NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-194SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/24/2016 (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/24/2016. (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2016. (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-11-088NOTICE of Summons with corrected address for Defendant State Department by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-099ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE (znmw) Modified on 11/10/2016 (jd) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-1010SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-1611RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/16/2016 (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-1812Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-18MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint on or before December 7, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/18/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/7/2016, (tj) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-12-0713ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-07MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before December 22, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/7/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-2214Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall begin rolling, monthly productions of the non-exempt records, or non-exempt portions of records, responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request on or before February 3, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before February 17, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/22/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/17/2017 (tj) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-02-1715Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before April 21, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/17/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/21/2017 (tj) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-04-2116Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before July 21, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/21/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/21/2017 (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-07-2117Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall continue rolling, monthly productions of non-exempt records, or non-exempt portions of records, responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request through October 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before October 20, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/21/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/20/2017 (tj) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-10-1818STIPULATION of Dismissal , joint, with prejudice by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff