Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2016cv06066
Date Filed2016-10-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. Saundra Brown Armstrong
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects
PlaintiffCenter For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the detention of asylum seekers. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. ICE denied the ACLU's request for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The ACLU appealed both decisions and the agency upheld its denial of expedited processing, but granted the fee waiver request. ICE provided some records, including publicly available policy statements. The ACLU appealed the adequacy of the search for both requests and ICE remanded the requests for further processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit. This is essentially the same complaint as 3:2016cv006066 although it was assigned to a different judge.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement an agency of the Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-201COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10865660.). Filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, CENTER FOR GENDER & REFUGEE STUDIES AT THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA HASTINGS COLLEGE OF THE LAW. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 10/20/2016) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-202Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, CENTER FOR GENDER & REFUGEE STUDIES AT THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA HASTINGS COLLEGE OF THE LAW (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 10/20/2016) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-203Case assigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (svS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-204Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2017 at 02:30 PM. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-215TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/21/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff