Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2016cv06066
Date Filed2016-10-20
Date Closed2017-08-09
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects
PlaintiffCenter For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the detention of asylum seekers. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. ICE denied the ACLU's request for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The ACLU appealed both decisions and the agency upheld its denial of expedited processing, but granted the fee waiver request. ICE provided some records, including publicly available policy statements. The ACLU appealed the adequacy of the search for both requests and ICE remanded the requests for further processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement an agency of the Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Opinion/Order [57]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-201COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10865660.). Filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, CENTER FOR GENDER & REFUGEE STUDIES AT THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA HASTINGS COLLEGE OF THE LAW. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 10/20/2016) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-202Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, CENTER FOR GENDER & REFUGEE STUDIES AT THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA HASTINGS COLLEGE OF THE LAW (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 10/20/2016) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-203Case assigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (svS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-204Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2017 at 02:30 PM. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-215TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/21/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-256ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra B Armstrong on 10/25/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-257ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on October 25, 2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-268NOTICE of Appearance by Michael King Thomas Tan (Tan, Michael) (Filed on 10/26/2016) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-269CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2016: # 1 Judge Corley's Standing Order) (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-2610CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 11/9/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-11-0411Proposed Summons. (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 11/4/2016) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-0712Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-0813CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law.. (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 11/8/2016) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-0914CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law re 12 Summons Issued as to USA (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 11/9/2016) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-0915SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 11/7/2016, answer due 1/6/2017. (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 11/9/2016) Modified on 11/10/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-0916CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law re 12 Summons Issued as to USA (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 11/9/2016) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-1717NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Bibb Davis (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 11/17/2016) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-1718CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 11/17/2016) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-12-0119STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 12/1/2016) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-0120ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-2221MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11026811.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 12/22/2016) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2222STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11026811.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 12/22/2016) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2223Declaration of Eunice Lee in Support of 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11026811.) filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 12/22/2016) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2224MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11026811.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/22/2016 filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 12/22/2016) Modified on 12/23/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2225Declaration of Yakov P. Wiegmann in Support of 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11026811.) filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 12/22/2016) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2226STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Statement filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 12/22/2016) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2227ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 22 Stipulation ADMITTING EUNICE LEE PRO HAC VICE. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2228ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 26 Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/2/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2229ORDER by Jagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Eunice Lee. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-01-0530ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 1/5/2017) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-1831ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order(ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-2032NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 1/20/2017) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
2017-01-2333ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (ACLU) (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 1/23/2017) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2334ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (CGRS) (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 1/23/2017) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2335ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 1/23/2017) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2336ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Friday, January 27, 2017, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-2637JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 1/26/2017) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-01-3038ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard Herman on 1/27/2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-3039MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Eunice Lee filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 1/30/2017) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-3040MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Michael Tan filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 1/30/2017) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-0141ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 39 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting 40 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-0242Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/2/2017. The parties shall meet and confer re: plan.Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2017. Statement shall address outstanding issues. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Yakov Wiegman; Angelica Salceda; Michael Tan via Court Call; Eunice Lee via Court Call. Defendant Attorney: Julie Bibb Davis. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2017) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-1543MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Statement filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 2/15/2017) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-1644JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 2/16/2017) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-1645Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/16/2017. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement Conference to occur in March, 2017. Further Case Management Conference to be set before Magistrate Judge Corley immediately after settlement conference. Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorneys: Yakov Wiegmann, Eunice Lee. Defendant Attorney: Julie Bibb Davis. This is a text only Minute Entry. There is no pdf image associated with this entry. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/17/2017) Modified on 2/23/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-1745Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/17/2017. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement Conference to occur in March, 2017. Further Case Management Conference to be set before Magistrate Judge Corley immediately after settlement conference. Total Time in Court: 15 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorneys: Yakov Wiegmann, Eunice Lee. Defendant Attorney: Julie Bibb Davis. This is a text only Minute Entry. There is no pdf image associated with this entry. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/17/2017) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-2246Order Setting Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 3/27/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/22/17. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-1547STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Continue Settlement Conference filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 3/15/2017) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-1648ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 47 Stipulation to Continue: Settlement Conference continued to 4/28/2017 11:00 AM. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
2017-04-2049NOTICE by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re Vacating of Settlement Conference (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 4/20/2017) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-2450ORDER vacating 4/28/2017 settlement conference in light of 49 Notice filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/24/2017. (This is a text-only entry; there is no document associated with this entry.)(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-05-0851NOTICE of Change of Address by Mishan Raini Wroe (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 5/8/2017) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-06-2252CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the case management conference is scheduled for August 10, 2017 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. The joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-08-0353JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 8/3/2017) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-0754MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Angelica Salceda filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 8/7/2017) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-0855ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 54 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Angelica Salceda. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-0856Joint MOTION for Settlement filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 8/22/2017. Replies due by 8/29/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 8/8/2017) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-0957ORDER granting Joint Motion for settlement. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Corley on 8/9/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
2017-08-1158STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND LITIGATION COSTS filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center For Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wiegmann, Yakov) (Filed on 8/11/2017) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-1159ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 58 Stipulation to Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Litigation Costs. Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees may be filed up to and including 9/12017.(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff