Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROSENBERG v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02117
Date Filed2016-10-24
Date Closed2017-09-21
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffCAROL ROSENBERG
Case DescriptionCarol Rosenberg, a reporter for the Miami Herald, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense's Southern Command for records concerning staffing levels at the detention facility at Guantanamo Bay. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after the agency failed to respond substantively, Rosenberg filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4719595) filed by CAROL ROSENBERG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons)(Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-25Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (sb) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-253STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/25/2016. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-11-084NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General November 1, 2016. (Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/1/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/1/2016. (Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/31/2016 (Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-298MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John Langford, :Firm- Media Freedom & Information Access Clinic, :Address- P.O. Box 208215, New Haven, CT New Haven, CT 06520. Phone No. - (203) 436-5831. Fax No. - (203) 432-3034 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4759395. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAROL ROSENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Langford, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-11-309Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Cover Sheet,, Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-12-08MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant has up to and including 12/15/2016 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/8/2016. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-08MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Admission of Attorney John Langford Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that John Langford be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/8/2016. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/15/2016. (tb) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-1510ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-3012ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file a joint status report by January 16, 2017, in which they will propose a briefing schedule should one be necessary at that time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/28/2016. (jth) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-1713Joint STATUS REPORT by CAROL ROSENBERG. (Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-1814ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file a joint status report by February 16, 2017, in which they will propose a briefing schedule should one be necessary at that time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/18/2017. (jth) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-02-1615Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Order by CAROL ROSENBERG. (Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-2116ORDER re 15 Status Report filed by CAROL ROSENBERG: It is hereby ordered that the parties will file a joint status report by 3/20/2017, in which they will proposed a briefing schedule should one be necessary at that time. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 02/17/17. (tb) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-03-2017Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-25MINUTE ORDER re 17 Joint Status Report. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file a joint status report by 4/19/2017, in which they will proposed a briefing schedule should one be necessary at that time. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/25/2017. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 03/25/2017)
2017-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report by 4/19/2017, in which the parties will propose a briefing schedule, should one be necessary at that time. (jth) (Entered: 03/26/2017)
2017-04-1718ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/28/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/27/2017. (Schulz, David) Modified on 4/17/2017 (zrdj). (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-17NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 18 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error (wrong case). (zrdj) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-1919Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-08-2520Joint STATUS REPORT by CAROL ROSENBERG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
2017-08-28NOTICE OF ERROR re 20 Status Report; emailed to hannah.bloch-wehba@yale.edu, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. In future, attorney signature must match ECF login. Do not refile. (znmw, ) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-2021ENTERED IN ERROR.....STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by CAROL ROSENBERG. (Schulz, David) Modified on 9/20/2017 (jf). (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-20NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 21 Stipulation of Dismissal was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled using the correct login/password. (jf) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2022STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by CAROL ROSENBERG. (Bloch-Wehba, Hannah) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-21NOTICE OF ERROR re 22 Stipulation of Dismissal; emailed to hannah.bloch-wehba@yale.edu, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. In future, ECF Login must match attorney signature on document; Do not refile. (znmw, ) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff