Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02136
Date Filed2016-10-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the 2012 school shooting at Sandy Hook, CT. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4720706) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Justice)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-252LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-26Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sb) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-11-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/31/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/30/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/31/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-12-015NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-016ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-027ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before December 15, 2016. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/02/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-148Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before March 15, 2017, providing the court with an update on the production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/15/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2017-03-139Joint STATUS REPORT (Second) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13MINUTE ORDER: In light of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before June 15, 2017, providing the court with an update on the production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/13/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-27MINUTE ORDER: In light of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before June 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/27/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-27Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-06-1510Joint STATUS REPORT (THIRD) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-16MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' Third Joint Status Report, the parties shall file an additional joint report concerning the status of this matter no later than September 20, 2017. That report shall set forth a proposed summary judgment briefing schedule, if disputed issues remain between the parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/16/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff