Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02154
Date Filed2016-10-27
Date Closed2017-07-31
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffSTUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.
PlaintiffTRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY 17-cv-485
Case DescriptionStudents for Fair Admissions submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning an investigation of Princeton University. Despite a number of attempts by the organization to determine the status of its request, Students for Fair Admissions filed suit after hearing nothing further from the agency.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS 17-cv-485
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4723631) filed by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Connolly, John) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-10-272Corporate Disclosure Statement by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. (Connolly, John) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-10-28Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sb) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-11-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/1/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/1/2016. (Connolly, John) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/1/2016. (Connolly, John) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 10/31/2016 (Connolly, John) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-12-017NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-018Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Granting 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 1/30/2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/2/16. (DJS) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2017-01-309Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-01MINUTE ORDER: Granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/1/17. (DJS) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-03-3010Consent MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-05-09Case consolidated. NO FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THIS CASE. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE LEAD NO. 17-CV-485 TSC ONLY. (ztd) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-07-1711ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Daniel Schaefer Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00485-TSC, 1:16-cv-02154-TSC(Snell, Kevin) Modified on 7/18/2017 (td). (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 11 Substitution of Counsel; emailed to kevin.snell@usdoj.gov, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The Lead Case is 17-485. Do not spread or file documents in the other cases. See docket entry of 05/09/2017. (ztd, ) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff