Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALFORD v. MCDONALD
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02170
Date Filed2016-10-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffLEROY ALFORD
Case DescriptionLeroy Alford, a disabled veteran, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for an Individual Written Rehabilitation Plan. After the agency failed to respond, Alford filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantROBERT A. MCDONALD Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [22]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-10-311COMPLAINT against ROBERT A. MCDONALD ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616081362) filed by LEROY ALFORD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-10-31SUMMONS Not Issued as to ROBERT A. MCDONALD (jf) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-10SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ROBERT A. MCDONALD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jd) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-12-062NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-213Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by ROBERT A. MCDONALD (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-274MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by LEROY ALFORD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
2017-01-115ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to; granting 4 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/11/2017. (lcrcl3, ) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/30/2017. (zlsj) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-116FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROBERT A. MCDONALD filed by LEROY ALFORD.(znmw) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-307MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROBERT A. MCDONALD (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Declaration Nykeisha Grant)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-018MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by LEROY ALFORD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/05/2017)
2017-02-169ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/16/2017. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-03-0710Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LEROY ALFORD. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-1511Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROBERT A. MCDONALD (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-2012ORDER granting 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Defendant shall file a Reply by 3/29/2017. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/20/17. (zlsj) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2913REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT A. MCDONALD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-0514MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by LEROY ALFORD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-0515ERRATA by LEROY ALFORD 14 MOTION for Leave to File filed by LEROY ALFORD. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-0716ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/6/17. (zlsj) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1017SURREPLY to re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LEROY ALFORD. (jf) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-05-2218MOTION for Leave to AMEND PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO REQUEST A HEARING by LEROY ALFORD (zrdj) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-08-2819ORDER Defendant shall file supplemental briefing within ten (10) days explaining where it located Ex. 5 attached to defendant's motion 7 for summary judgment, the document's purpose/context, and why it was not included with previously produced documents.. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/28/17. (lcrcl1, ) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-09-0620RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 19 Order, Defendant's Supplement in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT A. MCDONALD. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-1321MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's 20 Supplemental Response in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by LEROY ALFORD (jf) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-2623SUPPLEMENTAL Response re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LEROY ALFORD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
2017-09-2822MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Motion 7 for Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. It is further ORDERED that the Defendant shall pay the Plaintiff $400 in restitution for filing fees and a status report shall be filed within 30 days of the date of this Order. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/28/17. (lsj) Modified on 9/28/2017 (zlsj). (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-0324ERRATA by LEROY ALFORD 23 Supplemental Memorandum filed by LEROY ALFORD. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff