Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSmith v. U.S. Department of Agriculture
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2016cv06312
Date Filed2016-11-01
Date Closed2017-03-21
JudgeHon. Vince Chhabria
PlaintiffMatt Smith
Case DescriptionMatt Smith, an investigative reporter at the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for a variety of records. Smith also asked for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Smith filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-011COMPLAINT For Declatory And Injunctive Relief For Violation Of The Freedom of Informaiton Act against U.S. Department of Agriculture ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10897312.). Filed byMatt Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/1/2016) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-012Case assigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-023Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2017. Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-024Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-155CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matt Smith re 4 Summons Issued as to USA, 1 Complaint, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/15/2016) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-286CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matt Smith re 4 Summons Issued as to USA, 1 Complaint, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/28/2016) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-12-167ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Department of Agriculture. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 12/16/2016) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2017-01-178STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Stipulation to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference and Exempt Case From Initial Disclosure Requirements of Rule 26(f) filed by Matt Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas R. Burke in Support of Joint Stipulation to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference, # 2 Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 1/17/2017) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-189Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 8 Stipulation to Vacate Initial Case Management Conference and Exempt Case from Initial Disclosure Requirements of Rule 26(f). Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-03-0610ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-0711NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Pereda, David) (Filed on 3/7/2017) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-0712ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on March 15, 2017 at 1:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-0813ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/8/2017) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-1414CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Department of Agriculture. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 3/14/2017) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
2017-03-1515ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 3/15/2017 with Tamara Lange. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 4/18/2017 at 10:00 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-2116Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/21/2017. Parties agree to the Court issuing a conditional order of dismissal as the case is close to resolution.Total Time in Court 2 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney Thomas Burke. Defendant Attorney David Pereda. This is a text only Minute Entry (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2017) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-2117ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/21/2017. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff