Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02178
Date Filed2016-11-01
Date Closed2017-02-22
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning the appointment or reappointment of members of the New England Fishery Management Council. The agency disclosed 19 documents, but redacted portions of three documents as non-responsive. Cause of Action Institute filed an administrative appeal of those redactions. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION United States Department of Commerce
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-011COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4728492) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ex. 1, # 2 Exhibit ex. 2, # 3 Exhibit ex. 3, # 4 Exhibit ex. 4, # 5 Exhibit ex. 5, # 6 Exhibit ex. 6, # 7 Exhibit ex. 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons NOAA, # 10 Summons AG, # 11 Summons Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-012Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-01Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sb) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-024NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Bolinder on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION served on 11/3/2016 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/04/2016. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/7/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/7/2016. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-12-028NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-059Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Mark Graff, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-06MINUTE ORDER granting 9 defendant's consent motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than February 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/6/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 2/7/2017, (mac) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2017-02-0610Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by NATIONAL OCEANIC & ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-06MINUTE ORDER granting 10 defendant's consent motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than February 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/6/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer due by 2/22/2017. (mac) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-2211STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff