Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02180
Date Filed2016-11-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for fingerprint identification data relating to criminal aliens. The organization made a second FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for data concerning incarcerated criminal aliens. FAIR submitted a third FOIA request to the Office of Justice Programs for data concerning incarceration of criminal aliens. After none of the three offices responded to their request, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantOFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-011COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4728926) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate LCR 7.1, # 2 Summons for FBI, # 3 Summons for BOP, # 4 Summons for OJP, # 5 Summons for US Attorney, # 6 Summons for Attorney General, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-02Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sb) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-022SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-103RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 11/7/2016 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 11/7/2016 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS served on 11/7/2016 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/7/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/7/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/7/2016. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-12-078ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-08MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 12/22/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/8/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-089GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/8/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-2210Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-27MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Based on the representations made in the parties' 10 Joint Motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 1/12/2017, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/27/2016. (lckbj1, ) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2017-01-1211Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-17MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations made in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before 2/9/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/17/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-02-0912Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-10MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 4/20/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/10/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-04-2013Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-04-24MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 5/25/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/24/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-05-2514Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF JUSTICE PROGRAMS. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-26MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 6/29/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/26/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-2915Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-07-03MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations made in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before 9/29/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/03/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff