Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02182
Date Filed2016-11-01
Date Closed2017-11-19
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning investigations of Donald Trump, the Trump Organization, and the Trump Foundation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4729551) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-02Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (sb) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-12-013RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/4/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/4/2016. (Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/04/2016. (Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/4/2016 (Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2016-12-056ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-06MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiffs on or before January 6, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/6/2016. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motion or report setting forth schedule for the completion of production of documents to plaintiffs due by 1/6/2017. (tg) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-097NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Emily Nestler on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Matthew A. Josephson (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-128AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-239Defendant's ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 8 Amended Complaint filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2017-01-0510Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report Setting Forth Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-06MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 10 unopposed motion for an extension of time. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiffs on or before January 20, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/6/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-1911Joint STATUS REPORT Setting Forth Agreed Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-19MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 joint status report, the parties shall file a joint status report by April 24, 2017 to update the Court on the status of the document productions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/19/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-04-1112Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-12MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 12 unopposed motion for an extension of time. The parties shall file a joint status report by May 1, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/12/2017.(lcabj3) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-1913NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie Leah Kneedler on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-1914Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production and File Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-20MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 14 unopposed motion for an extension of time. Defendant shall complete its production of documents to plaintiffs by April 28, 2017, and the parties shall file a joint status report by May 8, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/20/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
2017-05-0815Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-09MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 15 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 15, 2017 to propose a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/9/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
2017-05-1516Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 16 joint status report, the parties shall file a further joint status report by June 19, 2017, if the matter has not been voluntarily dismissed by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/15/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-06-1917Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-19MINUTE ORDER. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by July 19, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition, combined with any cross-motion for summary judgment and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by August 11, 2017. Defendant's reply, combined with any cross-opposition and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by September 8, 2017. And plaintiff's cross-reply, if necessary, shall be filed by September 22, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/19/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-07-1418Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Summary Judgment Briefing by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-14MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 18 unopposed motion for an extension of time. Defendant's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by August 25, 2017. Plaintiff's opposition, combined with any cross-motion for summary judgment and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by September 22, 2017. Defendant's reply, combined with any cross-opposition and supported by a single memorandum of points and authorities, shall be filed by October 18, 2017. And plaintiff's cross-reply, if necessary, shall be filed by November 1, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/14/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-08-1619Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Settlement Negotiations by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-17MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 19 joint motion to stay. The briefing schedule is hereby VACATED, and the parties shall file a further joint status report by September 15, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/17/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
2017-09-1420Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-15MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a further joint status report by October 27, 2017, if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/15/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-10-2721Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-10-30MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status report by December 22, 2017, if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/30/2017. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
2017-11-1822STIPULATION of Dismissal by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 11/18/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff