Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02198
Date Filed2016-11-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the agency's processing of Cause of Action Institute's January 23, 2014 FOIA request concerning improper communications between the White House and the IRS pertaining to confidential taxpayer information. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-031COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4732150) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ex. 1, # 2 Exhibit ex. 2, # 3 Exhibit ex. 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons IRS, # 6 Summons AG, # 7 Summons Clerk)(Smith, Julie) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-032Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Smith, Julie) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-04Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sb) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-054STANDING ORDER: See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/5/2016. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/05/2016)
2016-11-085NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 11/9/2016 (Smith, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/10/2016. (Smith, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-108RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/10/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/10/2016. (Smith, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-12-129ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Hagerman, Richard) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-13MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on December 20, 2016, at 10 a.m., to discuss the next steps for the litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/13/2016. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is set for 12/20/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13MINUTE ORDER: The status conference scheduled for December 20, 2016, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for December 19, 2016, at 10 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/13/2016. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 12/20/2016, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 12/19/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-1610NOTICE of Appearance by Nishant Kumar on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 12/19/2016. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 3/10/2017. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2017-03-0911STIPULATION of Dismissal As Agreed By Both Parties Filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff