Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02258
Date Filed2016-11-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted three FOIA requests to the National Security Agency for Inspector General reports, semi-annual reports, and reports of investigations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-141COMPLAINT against NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4743780) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-16Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sb) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-162SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-12-083NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-154Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-16MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 1/13/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/16/2016 (lckbj1) Modified on 12/21/2016 (zgdf). (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY served on 11/30/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/22/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/22/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/22/2016.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of USPS Service via Certified Mail)(Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 12/18/2016)
2016-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/13/2017 (gdf) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2017-01-136ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-17MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 2/3/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/17/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-02-037PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order,, Set Deadlines, by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-08MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposed briefing schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule is set for briefing Defendant's Open America motion: Defendant's motion is due on or before 2/24/2017; Plaintiff's opposition is due on or before 3/8/2017; and Defendant's reply is due on or before 3/15/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 02/08/2017. (lckbj1, ) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-228GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/22/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-229Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Open America Motion and Amend Briefing Schedule by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-24ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Open America Motion. It is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule previously set in this matter is amended as follows: Defendant's motion is due on or before 3/6/2017; Plaintiff's opposition is due on or before 3/20/2017; and Defendant's reply is due on or before 3/27/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 02/24/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-03-0610MOTION to Stay by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Sherman Declaration, # 2 Exhibits A-E, # 3 Exhibits F-L)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-07NOTICE OF ERROR re 10 Motion to Stay; emailed to Marina.Braswell@usdoj.gov, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please file an Errata with the correct order as an attachment. (ztd, ) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-2111Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Stay filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-21MINUTE ORDER. On February 22, 2017, this Court issued its 8 General Order and Guidelines for Civil Cases, which lays out in detail instructions for briefing any motion in this matter. Defendant's 10 Motion to Stay Proceedings, for Summary Judgment, does not conform to a number of these instructions, e.g., it does not contain a Table of Contents and Table of Authorities ( 5(a)(i)), it does not contain an index of exhibits ( 5(a)(vi)), and the various attachments to the motion are not filed as separate PDFs and appropriately labeled in ECF ( 3(c)(ii)). Plaintiff's 11 Opposition is likewise deficient in that it does not contain a full Table of Contents that reflects the subheadings in the brief. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before 3/27/2017, each party shall file an ERRATA attaching an updated copy of its filing that fully complies with this Court's 8 General Order and Guidelines. Any future submissions by either party that do not fully comply the 84 General Order and Guidelines will not be accepted. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/21/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-2212Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Stay by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-23MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 10 Motion to Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Reply re 10 is due on or before 4/4/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/23/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-2413ERRATA by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY 8 Order, Order,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings, # 2 Declaration (Declaration of David J. Sherman), # 3 Index of Exhibits to the Declaration of David J. Sherman, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-27NOTICE OF ERROR re 13 Errata; emailed to Marina.Braswell@usdoj.gov, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. The Index of Exhibits and Proposed Order has the incorrect case number and caption (ztd, ) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-2714ERRATA by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY Order,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits - caption corrected, # 2 Proposed Order - caption corrected)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-2715ERRATA by JASON LEOPOLD 10 MOTION to Stay filed by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Opposition, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-3116Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Stay by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-31MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's reply in support of its 10 Motion to Stay is due on or before April 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on March 31, 2017. (lckbj2) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-2117Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Stay by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-26MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 10 Motion to Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's reply in further support of 10 is due on or before 5/5/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/26/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-05-0518REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Stay filed by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Second Sherman Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-08-31MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant must file a status report, on or before September 14, 2017, containing an update on its progress toward processing the records that are responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on August 31, 2017. (lckbj2) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-1419STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1520ORDER. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on September 15, 2017. (lckbj2) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-2121RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 20 Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines filed by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-21MINUTE ORDER. Based on the government's representations made in Defendant's 21 Response to Show Cause Order, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's 10 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/21/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-10-1022STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-11-0823STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff