Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02262
Date Filed2016-11-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning communications related to the Atlantic Outer Continental Shelf and the agency's Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program. Cause of Action Institute also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Cause of Action Institute that it would consider whether a fee waiver was necessary depending on the number of responsive pages. The agency asked Cause of Action Institute to narrow its request, which it did. The parties had several other contacts, but after the agency indicated it could give no estimated date of completion, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-151COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4744168) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons DOI, # 9 Summons AG, # 10 Summons Clerk)(Steven, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-152Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-16Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sb) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 11/21/2016 (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/21/2016. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/21/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/21/2016. (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-287NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-12-198Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-21MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 1/25/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/21/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2017-01-239Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-24MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 2/22/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/24/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-02-2210GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/22/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-2211ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-02-23MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 3/9/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/23/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-03-0912Joint STATUS REPORT Proposing Production Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-13MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 5/31/2017, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/13/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-05-3113Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-05-31MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 7/21/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/31/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-07-2014Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-20MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before 11/1/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/20/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-11-0115Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
2017-11-02MINUTE ORDER. Based on the representations in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 12/15/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/2/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff