Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02264
Date Filed2016-11-15
Date Closed2017-09-07
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for communications concerning the agency's practice of maintaining "guest" accounts on agency networks. Cause of Action Institute also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Cause of Action Institute a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-151COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4744295) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons State, # 6 Summons AG, # 7 Summons Clerk)(Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-152Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-153NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-16Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (sb) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-164SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/21/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/21/2016. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/21/2016. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/21/2016 (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-12-218NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-219ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-2210GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 22, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-01-0511Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report providing the Court with a status of responsive document productions and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions on or before January 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 6, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2017 (hs) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-1912Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report providing the Court with a status of responsive document productions and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions on or before April 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 20, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
2017-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/28/2017 (hs) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-04-2813Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-04-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report providing the Court with a status of the production of responsive documents and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions on or before June 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 30, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/30/2017)
2017-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/5/2017 (hs) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-06-0514Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report providing the Court with a status of the production of responsive documents and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions on or before July 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 9, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
2017-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2017 (hs) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-07-1915Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report providing the Court with a status of this case and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions on or before September 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 20, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule and Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2017 (hs) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-09-0616STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 7, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff