Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. U.S. Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2016cv02793
Date Filed2016-11-16
Date Closed2017-03-17
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning wild horse gather contracts. Friends of Animals asked for a fee waiver. The agency granted FOA's request for a fee waiver, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Bureau of Land Management an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-161COMPLAINT against U.S. Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5247909)Attorney Michael Ray Harris added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons: BLM, # 4 Summons Summons: US Attorney-District of Colorado, # 5 Summons Summons: US Attorney General)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-172Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-173SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sphil, ) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-284MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. (dkals, ) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-285CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 4 Memorandum Returning Case: This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-02793-KLM. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, ) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-286Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dkals, ) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-287SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Animals. U.S. Bureau of Land Management served on 11/22/2016, answer due 12/13/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt for U.S. Bureau of Land Management)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-288SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Friends of Animals served on 11/21/2016, answer due 1/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt for USA)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-289SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipt for Attorney General)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-12-1410NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ian J. Kellogg on behalf of U.S. Bureau of Land ManagementAttorney Ian J. Kellogg added to party U.S. Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft) (Kellogg, Ian) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-2111ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Bureau of Land Management.(Kellogg, Ian) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-2112MINUTE ORDER that, on or before January 4, 2017, the parties shall file the Consent Form, indicating whether all parties do or do not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this civil action, including trial, and to order the entry of a final judgment, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/2016. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-2213CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Friends of Animals All parties consent.. (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2714ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge: Upon consent of the parties evidenced by Docket Entry #13, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.2(d) and 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/27/16. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2017-02-0115NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Ian J. Kellogg (Kellogg, Ian) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-03-1716STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case and Settlement by Plaintiff Friends of Animals. (Harris, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-17Civil Case Terminated by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/17/17 pursuant to 16 Text Only Entry (lgale, ) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff