Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. v. FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02308
Date Filed2016-11-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Railroad Administration for records concerning the agency's approval of Alaska Railroad Corporation's application to carry liquefied natural gas containers by rail. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-211COMPLAINT against FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4750783) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US ATTORNEY DC, # 3 Summons US AG, # 4 Summons FRA)(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-212REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected Summons FRA re 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC..(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-213REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected Summons US Attorney General re 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC..(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-214REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Corrected Summons US Attorney DC re 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC..(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-215Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-22Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sb) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-226SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-227STANDING ORDER: See attached document. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/22/2016. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-12-198RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/28/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/28/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-199RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION served on 11/28/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-1910RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/28/16. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kilduff, Catherine) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-2011NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-2012Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2016-12-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint 12 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before January 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/21/2016. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 1/27/2017. (kt) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2017-01-2713ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-01-28MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on February 7, 2017, at 2:00 p.m., to discuss the next stage of the litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/28/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/28/2017)
2017-01-29MINUTE ORDER: The status conference set for February 7, 2017, at 2:00 p.m., is hereby RESCHEDULED for the same day at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/29/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/29/2017)
2017-01-30Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is set for 2/7/2017, at 2:30 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-01-3114Unopposed MOTION to Reschedule February 7, 2017 Status Conference by FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's unopposed Motion to Reschedule Status Conference 14 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. The status conference set for February 7, 2017, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for February 22, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/1/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-01Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 2/7/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 2/22/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-1715STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by FEDERAL RAILROAD ADMINISTRATION. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-17MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice 15 , this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the status conference set for February 22, 2017, be VACATED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/17/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff