Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNADOLNY et al v. UNITED STATES CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2016cv06113
Date Filed2016-11-21
Date Closed2017-02-02
JudgeHONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON
PlaintiffTRICIA NADOLNY
PlaintiffPHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, PBC
Case DescriptionTricia Nadolny, a reporter for the Philadelphia Inquirer, submitted ten FOIA requests to the Consumer Product Safety Commission for records concerning the safety hazards posed by IKEA dressers that were prone to tip over. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Nadolny filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 150444.), filed by TRICIA NADOLNY, PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, PBC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheets)(tj, ) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-21Summons 1 Issued as to UNITED STATES CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION. Given To: Counsel on 11/21/16 (tj, ) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-11-212Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, Corporate Parent PBC CHARITABLE TRUST, Corporate Parent THE INSTITUTE FOR JOURNALISM IN NEW MEDIA, LLC, Corporate Parent TPF SPECIAL ASSETS FUND for PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, PBC. by PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, PBC.(tj, ) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2016-12-063SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRICIA NADOLNY, PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, PBC re: Eli Segal served Summons and Complaint upon UNITED STATES CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION by Certified Mail. UNITED STATES CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION served on 11/23/2016, answer due 12/14/2016. (SCOTT, ELLEN) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-064SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRICIA NADOLNY, PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, PBC re: Eli Segal served Summons and Complaint upon UNITED STATES CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION by Certified Mail. (SEGAL, ELI) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-215STIPULATION AND ORDER TO HOLD THIS MATTER IN ABEYANCE AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/21/2016. 12/22/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-02-026NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TRICIA NADOLNY, PHILADELPHIA MEDIA NETWORK, PBC As To UNITED STATES CONSUMER PRODUCT SAFETY COMMISSION WITHOUT Prejudice(SEGAL, ELI) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff