Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02367
Date Filed2016-12-05
Date Closed2017-08-08
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning emails sent or received by Director of Policy Anne-Marie Slaughter at her Princeton University email account pertaining to agency business from January 2009 February 2011. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-051COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4764576) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Dep't of State, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-06Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (sb) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/11/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/12/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/12/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C.Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2017-01-115ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by January 26, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/12/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by 1/26/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-246Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-24MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by May 15, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/24/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-04-147NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Andrew Evan Carmichael on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Bailey W. Heaps (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-05-158Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Carmichael, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-05-15MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, (1) Defendant shall continue to review and process responsive documents at a rate of 175-200 documents per month, (2) the parties shall continue to provide joint status reports every 90 days until the completion of production, and (3) the parties shall submit a joint scheduling proposal within 30 days of the final production. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/15/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
2017-08-079STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-08MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 9 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/8/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff