Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02369
Date Filed2016-12-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records discovered, recovered, or retrieved from any equipment connected to or used to backup former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton's email system. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4764781) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US DOJ, # 3 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 4 Summons US Attorney General)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-06Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sb) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-064STANDING ORDER: See attached document. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/6/2016. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/11/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/12/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/12/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2017-01-116ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-11MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on January 24, 2017, at 2:30 p.m., to discuss the next stage of the litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/11/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-12Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is set for 1/24/2017, at 2:30 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-177NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bekesha on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-24Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 1/24/2017. Order forthcoming setting a further status conference. (Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones). (kt) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-25MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a further status conference on February 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/25/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-26Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is set for 2/7/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-02-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 2/7/2017. Issues addressed. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-078TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on January 24, 2017; Page Numbers: 1 - 45. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 2/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2017.(Jones, Cathryn) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-169TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Randolph D. Moss held on February 7, 2017; Page Numbers: 1 - 31. Date of Issuance: February 16, 2017. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook. Telephone number: 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referen ced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2017.(Hook, Jeff) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-09-15Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-11-0210Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Judge Timothy J. Kelly is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff