Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals et al v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2016cv03007
Date Filed2016-12-08
Date Closed2017-03-16
JudgeJudge David M. Ebel
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
PlaintiffSea Shepherd Legal
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals and Sea Shepherd Legal submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning final and pending approvals for anthropogenic activities affecting the Cook Inlet beluga whale. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals and Sea Shepherd Legal filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-081COMPLAINT against National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5279749)Attorney Michael Ray Harris added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals, Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-082Case assigned to Judge David M. Ebel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-093SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, ) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-274SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Friends of Animals served on 12/12/2016, answer due 2/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt for USA Attorney)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2016-12-275SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration served on 12/12/2016, answer due 2/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt for USA Attorney)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2016-12-276SUMMONS Returned Executed upon USA Attorney, Attorney General, and NOAA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service for Attorney General, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service for NOAA)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
2017-01-037NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marisela Desire Sandoval on behalf of National Oceanic and Atmospheric AdministrationAttorney Marisela Desire Sandoval added to party National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration(pty:dft) (Sandoval, Marisela) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-118ANSWER to 1 Complaint by National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration.(Sandoval, Marisela) (Modified on 1/11/2017 edited to add link to 1 )(evana, ). (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-02-019NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Marisela Desire Sandoval (Sandoval, Marisela) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-0110ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Judge David M. Ebel on 2/1/2017. (evana, ) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-0111ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/6/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/01/2017. (slibi, ) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-2712Joint MOTION to Vacate 11 Order Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference by Defendant National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sandoval, Marisela) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-2713MEMORANDUM regarding 12 Joint MOTION to Vacate 11 Order Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Judge David M. Ebel on 2/27/2017. (evana, ) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-2714ORDER granting 12 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/27/2017. The Parties shall submit a Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal or, in the alternative, a Joint Status Report no later than 4/5/2017. (slibi, ) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-1015SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL by Defendant National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Sandoval, Marisela) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-1616ORDER DISMISSING CASE: THE COURT, having reviewed the Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal (Doc. No. 15) and being fully advised in the premises, DOES HEREBY ORDER that this civil action is dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), by Judge David M. Ebel on 3/16/2017. (evana, ) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff