Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02406
Date Filed2016-12-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Justice submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning its asset forfeiture database. The Institute for Justice also requested a fee waiver. The agency told the Institute for Justice that the request would require 34,000 hours and would cost $753,000. The Institute for Justice appealed the denial of its request for a fee waiver. The agency told the Institute for Justice that its fee waiver request was imperfect/invalid because it did not meet the requirements of FOIA. The Institute for Justice then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
AppealD.C. Circuit 18-5316
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Opinion/Order [39]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Trevor McFadden has ruled that the IRS properly responded to the Institute for Justice's request for a database dump of its Asset Forfeiture Tracking and Retrieval System, which monitors seized assets, by providing a heavily redacted 78-page Excel table because the information is largely protected by Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). In response to the Institute for Justice's request, the agency initially told the Institute that processing its request would cost $753,760. After the Institute filed suit, the IRS produced the heavily redacted table. The Institute argued that the IRS should have provided an electronic copy of the contents of its AFTRAK database. But McFadden pointed out that "the IRS produced a Report that " in unredacted form " contains every data point on every relevant seized asset. The Institute argues that even if AFTRAK is not a database, the IRS should have searched for all records accessible through its AFTRAK system. But that is essentially what happened. The Institute fails to identify any record, or even a single data point, that the IRS improperly excluded from its search when it created the Report." He observed that "the real problem for the Institute is the Report's format, not the data itself. But the IRS has abundantly established that the other formats proved unobtainable." Turning to the agency's exemption claims, McFadden found the agency had properly applied Exemption 7(A) as well as Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). McFadden noted that "since the Report is a giant table, and each line on the report represents a single seizure, this results in the line for each 'open' asset being redacted in full." The Institute argued that the agency had not adequately described the columns being withheld and that the Department of Justice has released similar information. McFadden indicated that "granted, individuals will likely know when their property has been seized. But further specific information might give tips about the larger investigation that 'could result in the destruction or dissipation of additional assets that might also be subject to seizure at a later date." McFadden agreed that the privacy exemptions applied as well. He noted that information contained in two columns was not publicly available and pointed out that "making them available for cross-referencing against public seizure notices could endanger the substantial privacy interests of investigation targets." He added that "the Court credits the Institute's representation that it is vindicating the public interest in learning about law enforcement policy and civil forfeitures. But that generalized interest is outweighed by the specific privacy interest. . . that asset owners have in 'ensuring that their relationship in the investigation remains secret.'"
Issues: Adequacy - Search, Choice of format, Exemption 7(A) - Interference with ongoing investigation, Exemption 7(C) - Invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-081COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4768653) filed by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for I.R.S., # 4 Summons for U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-082LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-08Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (jd) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-093NOTICE of Errata by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-124SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/14/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/13/2017. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/14/2016. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-01-137Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-15MINUTE ORDER granting 7 defendant's consent motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later than February 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 01/15/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/15/2017)
2017-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/13/2017. (mac) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-02-138ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-149STANDING FOIA ORDER. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/14/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/7/2017. (mac) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-03-0710MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-09MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' joint meet and confer statement, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report by no later than April 6, 2017 addressing the status of the records production and the need for a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/9/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2017. (mac) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-04-0611Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-07MINUTE ORDER. In view of 11 the parties' joint status report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint status report by no later than May 8, 2017 and to continue to file joint status reports every 30 days thereafter until the parties have settled this dispute or until a party represents to the Court that settlement is unlikely and that a briefing schedule should be implemented. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/7/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/8/2017. (mac) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-05-0812Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-10MINUTE ORDER. In view of the separate statements provided by the parties in 12 their joint status report, the parties are hereby directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by no later than June 28, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its opposition by no later than August 2, 2017. If plaintiff chooses to file a cross-motion, it shall be combined with the opposition and filed on the same date. Defendant shall file its reply and, if applicable, combined opposition by no later than August 16, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its reply, if applicable, by no later than August 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/10/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment due by 6/28/2017. Plaintiff Opposition And/If Plaintiff Chooses To File A Cross-Motion, It Shall Be Combined With The Opposition due by 8/2/2017. Defendant Reply And/If Applicable, Combined Opposition due by 8/16/2017. Plaintiff Reply, If Applicable, due by 8/30/2017. (mac) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-06-2613Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Modify Briefing Schedule by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting 13 defendant's unopposed motion to modify the briefing schedule. Defendant shall now file its motion for summary judgment by no later than July 10, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its opposition by no later than August 14, 2017. If plaintiff chooses to file a cross-motion, it shall be combined with the opposition and filed on the same date. Defendant shall file its reply and, if applicable, combined opposition by no later than August 28, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its reply, if applicable, by no later than September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/27/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment due by 7/10/2017. Plaintiff Opposition And/Or If Plaintiff Chooses To File A Cross-Motioin, It Shall Be Combined With The Opposition due by 8/14/2017. Defendant Reply, And, If Applicable, Combined Opposition due by 8/28/2017. Plaintiff Reply, If Applicable, due by 9/11/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-07-1014MOTION for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of D. Martin, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-08-1415MOTION to Continue for Rule 56(d) Continuance and Leave to Take Discovery re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, # 7 Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 8 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 9 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 10 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 11 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 12 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 13 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 14 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 15 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 16 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 17 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 18 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 19 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Prins, Andrew) Added MOTION for Discovery on 8/15/2017 (nmw). (Entered: 08/14/2017)
2017-08-2816Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Continue MOTION for Discovery filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-2817REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (See Docket Entry 16 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-2918Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION to Continue MOTION for Discovery by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-30MINUTE ORDER granting 18 plaintiff's consent motion for first extension of time to file a reply. Plaintiff shall submit their reply in support of their Motion for Rule 56(d) Continuance and Leave to Take Discovery by September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/30/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Reply In Support OF Their Motion For Rule 56(d) Continuance And Leave To Take Discovery due by 9/11/2017. (mac) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-1119REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Continue MOTION for Discovery filed by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-11-02Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2018-03-0720VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 3/8/18. . . . .ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, the Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Rule 56(d) Continuance and Leave to Take Discovery is hereby DENIED. IJ shall file its opposition to the Government's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment on or before March 28, 2018. Any Government reply shall be filed on or before April 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/7/2018. (lctnm2) Modified on 3/9/2018 (td). (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/28/2018. Government's reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/11/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-0821ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Amended Order, the Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Rule 56(d) Continuance and Leave to Take Discovery is hereby DENIED. IJ shall file its opposition to the Government's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment on or before April 6, 2018. Any Government reply shall be filed on or before April 27, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the 20 Order entered March 7, 2018, is hereby VACATED, and replaced with this Amended Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/8/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/6/2018. Government's reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/27/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-2722Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-28MINUTE ORDER. The Plaintiff's unopposed 22 Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. The Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment on or before April 20, 2018, and the Government shall file any reply to Plaintiff's opposition on or before May 11, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/28/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/20/2018. Government's reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/11/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-04-2023Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant Internal Revenue Service's Motion for Summary Judgment by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Prins Declaration, # 3 Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 4 Exhibit 1 to McDonald Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2 to McDonald Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3 to McDonald Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 4 to McDonald Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 5 to McDonald Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 6 to McDonald Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 7 to McDonald Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 8 to McDonald Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 9 to McDonald Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 10 to McDonald Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 11 to McDonald Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 12 to McDonald Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 13 to McDonald Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 14 to McDonald Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 15 to McDonald Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 16 to McDonald Declaration, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2324Memorandum in opposition to re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (See docket entry no. 23 to view.) (td) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2525STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Courtesy copies are excused for all filings predating the entry of this Standing Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/25/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-1126REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) Modified text and linkage on 5/15/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1127Memorandum in opposition to re 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant Internal Revenue Service's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1828REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant Internal Revenue Service's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 2 Exhibit 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer McDonald, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer McDonald)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-2529MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply to Plaintiff's Combined Reply and Opposition by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-3030Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply to Plaintiff's Combined Reply and Opposition filed by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-31MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the IRS's 29 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply, and the Plaintiff's 30 Opposition, the 29 Motion for Leave is hereby GRANTED IN PART. The IRS may file a sur-reply addressing the Plaintiff's latest supplemental declaration and the exhibits thereto, and the Plaintiff's argument relying on 5 U.S.C. § 552(c)(1). However, the Plaintiff's argument that "the IRS clearly understood... that IJ sought... the discrete universe of records that is accessible through AFTRAK," ECF No. 11 at 11, is not "truly new," U.S. ex rel. Pogue v. Diabetes Treatment Centers of Am., Inc. , 238 F. Supp. 2d 270, 277 (D.D.C. 2002), and the 29 Motion for Leave is DENIED as to this argument. The IRS shall file a sur-reply by June 1, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/31/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: IRS' sur-reply due by 6/1/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-0131SURREPLY to 28 Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) Modified on 6/4/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-0532ORDER regarding certain records withheld by the Defendant. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/5/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: IRS' notice of compliance or supplemental declaration due by 7/6/2018. Plaintiff's response due by 7/20/2018. IRS' reply due by 7/27/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-2933Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with June 5, 2018 Order by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the IRS' 33 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, that motion is GRANTED. The IRS shall comply with the Court's 32 Order on or before September 4, 2018. To the extent that the IRS chooses to file a supplemental declaration, the Plaintiff may file a response on or before September 18, 2018, and the IRS may file a reply by September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/30/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: The IRS shall comply with the Court's 32 Order on or before 9/4/2018. Plaintiff's response due by 9/18/2018. IRS' reply due by 9/24/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-09-0434AFFIDAVIT re 32 Order re Information Withheld Pursuant to Exemptions 6 and 7(C) by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0435NOTICE of Compliance by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE re 32 Order (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-1836RESPONSE re 34 Affidavit, 35 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Supplemental Declaration and Notice of Compliance filed by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-2437MOTION to Strike 36 Response to Document by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-2438REPLY re 36 Response to Document filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-2839MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Defendant's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 23 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/28/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-2840ORDER. For the reasons stated in the 39 Memorandum Opinion, Defendant's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 23 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment are both GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/28/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-1241WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 01/27/2020..... MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Andrew D. Prins, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Prins, Andrew) Modified on 1/28/2020 (zpt). (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-1942BILL OF COSTS by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. Objection to Bill of Costs due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-2243Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-23MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for a Report and Recommendation regarding attorney's fees. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 73.1, they may consent to the assignment of this action to a magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial; consent of the presiding judge is not necessary. It is further ORDERED that any future filings related to this matter shall include the initials of the presiding judge and the magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/23/2018. (lctnm2) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-23CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for a Report and Recommendation regarding attorney's fees. (ad) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-2544NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 40 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, 39 Memorandum & Opinion, 21 Order,, by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5757733. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-2545ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to; Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/29/2018 Replies due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 10/25/18. (lcgmh1) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-2646Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 44 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (tth) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2947Memorandum in opposition to re 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan O. McMonagle, # 2 Declaration of Joycelyn S. Peyton, # 3 Appendix)(McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-31USCA Case Number 18-5316 for 44 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0148Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0149ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs ; Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 11/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 11/1/18. (lcgmh1) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0750REPLY to opposition to motion re 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Andrew Prins, # 2 Declaration Jennifer McDonald, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2019-02-0851Consent MOTION to Stay Case and Hold Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Dkt. No. 41) And Costs In Abeyance Pending Resolution of Appeal by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prins, Andrew). Added MOTION to Hold in Abeyance on 2/11/2019 (tth). (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-11MINUTE ORDER granting 51 Motion to Stay. Upon considering the parties' 51 Consent Motion to Stay, it is hereby ordered that this matter is stayed. The Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Attorney's Fees will be held in abeyance pending resolution of the appeal before the D.C. Circuit, and the Plaintiff is ordered to file a motion to lift the stay once the D.C. Circuit issues its mandate in the appeal. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 02/11/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-12-3152MANDATE of USCA as to 44 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE ; USCA Case Number 18-5316. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Judgment)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-07MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with the ruling of the U.S. Court of Appeals, the Clerk of the Court is directed to re-open this case. The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report on or before February 6, 2020. The report should provide a recommendation for how this matter should proceed. The parties are further ORDERED to appear for a status conference on February 10, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/7/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/07/2020)
2020-01-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-08Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-0953ORDER. See Order for details. Status Report due by 2/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 1/9/20. (MFB) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-2754NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE re 41 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-02-0455NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas L Schlossman on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE (Schlossman, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-0656Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Status Conference held on 2/10/2020. The parties are ordered to meet and confer, in person, and file a new Joint Status Report by 3/16/2020. A further Status Conference is set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim.) (hmc) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-03-04NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference originally set for 3/19/2020, is rescheduled for 3/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-1657Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 57 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before April 15, 2020. The report should update the Court on the status of the parties' discussions regarding the scope of the search and other relevant matters. It is further ORDERED that the status conference set for March 27, 2020, is hereby VACATED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/16/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-04-1558Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 58 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's FOIA request consistent with Plaintiff's position that "the IRS must produce AFTRAK records from 2000 to March/April 2020 ( i.e. , when the IRS begins an adequate, reasonable search)." ECF No. 58, at 6; see In Def. of Animals v. NIH , 543 F. Supp. 2d 83, 99 (D.D.C. 2008). It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their next Joint Status Report on or before May 29, 2020. The report should update the Court on the progress of Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/16/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-05-2959Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 59 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their next Joint Status Report on or before July 20, 2020, further updating the Court on the status of Defendant's release of AFTRAK records to Plaintiff, and the parties' ongoing discussions about any disputed exemptions from disclosure. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/29/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-0560TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Trevor N. McFadden held on 02/10/2020; Page Numbers: 1-13. Date of Issuance:06/05/2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber Crystal M. Pilgrim, Telephone number 202.354.3127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenc ed above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2020.(Pilgrim, Crystal) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-07-2061Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 61 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their next Joint Status Report on or before September 3, 2020, further updating the Court on the status of Defendant's release of AFTRAK records to Plaintiff, and the parties' ongoing discussions about any disputed exemptions from disclosure. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/20/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-09-0362Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 62 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their next Joint Status Report on or before October 19, 2020, further updating the Court on the status of Defendant's release of AFTRAK records to Plaintiff, and the parties' ongoing discussions about any disputed exemptions from disclosure. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/4/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2020. (zhmc) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-10-1963Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 63 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit the next Joint Status Report on or before 11/30/2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/20/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-11-3064Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 64 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit the next Joint Status Report on or before 1/14/2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/30/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2021-01-1465Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Peyton, Joycelyn) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 65 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit the next Joint Status Report on or before March 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/14/2021. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-03-0166Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 66 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit the next Joint Status Report on or before April 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/2/2021. (lctnm2) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar