Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title(PS) Glass v. US Department of Justice et al
DistrictEastern District of California
CitySacramento
Case Number2:2016cv02907
Date Filed2016-12-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Kimberly J. Mueller
PlaintiffLeigh Glass
Case DescriptionLeigh Glass filed suit against the Department of Housing and Urban Development to force the agency to stop claiming that she had refused to contact them concerning a complaint. An Assistant U.S. Attorney in Sacramento was assigned to represent HUD. Glass cites FOIA as the basis for her suit against the Justice Department, but aside from allegations that they are making false claims against her, she has not filed a FOIA request or an administrative appeal.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to Exhaust, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of Justice
DefendantWendy A. Garbers AUSA
DefendantSara Winslow Supervising AUSA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [3]
Opinion/Order [5]
Opinion/Order [7]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-121COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Leigh Glass. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-122MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Leigh Glass. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2017-01-063ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/6/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Washington, S) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06SERVICE BY MAIL: 3 Order, served on Leigh Glass. (Washington, S) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-02-074MOTION for RECONSIDERATION of 3 Order dismissing complaint with leave to amend by Leigh Glass. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-105ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/10/2017 ORDERING 4 that no later than 3/10/2017 plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that complies with the 1/6/2017 order; Failure to timely file an amended complaint will result in a recommendation that the action be dismissed. (Reader, L) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-10SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Order, served on Leigh Glass. (Reader, L) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-03-096OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Leigh Glass to 5 Order. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-157FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/15/17 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice; referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&Rs due within 14 days. (Benson, A) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-15SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Findings and Recommendations served on Leigh Glass. (Benson, A) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff