Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02432
Date Filed2016-12-13
Date Closed2017-02-06
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a number of various organizations. The focus of the request, however, was to determine the pattern of contacts the FBI may have had with conservative organizations opposing Hillary Clinton. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-131COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4773787) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-132NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. Case related to Case No. 15-2117-RDM. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sb) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-134STANDING ORDER for proceedings before Judge Moss. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/13/2016. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2017-01-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/13/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/12/2017. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/21/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/21/2016. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-197Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baer, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer 7 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before January 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/22/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/22/2017)
2017-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before 1/23/2017. (dot) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-238MOTION to Dismiss by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baer, Michael) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-02-069NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JASON LEOPOLD, RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-06MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 8 be DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/6/2017. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff