Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02434
Date Filed2016-12-13
Date Closed2017-05-25
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning how the agency formulated its anti-arbitration rule and conducted its arbitration study. The agency located 3,554 pages. It disclosed 845 pages in full and 832 pages in part, and withheld 1,877 pages under Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures), Exemption 4 (confidential business information), Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Cause of Action Institute filed an administrative appeal. The agency denied Cause of Action Institute's appeal and Cause of Action Institute then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-12-131COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4774356) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons CFPB, # 11 Summons AG, # 12 Summons Clerk)(Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-132Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (sb) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-144NOTICE of Appearance by John Julian Vecchione on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Vecchione, John) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 12/19/2016 (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/19/2016. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/19/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/18/2017. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2017-01-188ANSWER to Complaint by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and propose a briefing schedule by February 6, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/23/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall meet, confer, and propose a briefing schedule by 2/6/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-02-069Joint MOTION for Extension of Time and STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Bolinder, Eric) Modified event title on 2/7/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report by February 27, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/6/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
2017-02-2710MOTION for Extension of Time by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) Modified event title on 2/28/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-28MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report by March 20, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/28/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-02-28Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Joint Status Report is due by 3/20/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-03-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-20MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' request, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before March 28, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/20/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/28/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-2012JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (See Docket Entry 11 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-2713Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion to enlarge by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-2714JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (See Docket entry 13 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-28MINUTE ORDER granting Joint 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 11, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/28/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/11/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-1115Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 21, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/12/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
2017-04-2116Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Joint Status by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-21MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 10, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/21/2017. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-04-2117Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (See Docket Entry 16 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-05-1018Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
2017-05-1019Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE, CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (See Docket Entry 18 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/24/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-11MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' request 18 , the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 24, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/11/2016. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-2420STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Bolinder, Eric) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-25MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 20 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/25/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff